Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Case #: 4:25-cv-00034
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:07 AM CST
Defendant
Credit Corp Solutions Inc
Plaintiff
Shanaequious Compton
Represented By
Tiffany Hill
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
20 20 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 04/09 2:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Initial) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/8/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 8/22/2025, Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
19 19 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion to Amend Wed 04/09 12:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting17 Motion to Amend (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Tue 04/08 5:30 PM
First JOINT STATUS REPORT by Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Lewis, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 motion Amend Mon 04/07 1:43 AM
First MOTION to Amend Complaint Related [+] by Shanaequious Compton (With attachments) (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
16 16 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 03/19 12:49 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Morgan Williams Smith on behalf of Credit Corp Solutions Inc [Note: Attorney Morgan Williams Smith added to party Credit Corp Solutions Inc(pty:dft).] (Smith, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Mon 03/17 5:08 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/8/2025) (GKF2, Chambers)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 03/17 5:02 PM
First DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Lewis, Caroline)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Answer Mon 03/17 4:57 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by Credit Corp Solutions Inc (Lewis, Caroline)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Credit Corp Solutions Inc to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/11 5:04 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline extended: 3/17/2025) ; granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/11 3:40 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by Credit Corp Solutions Inc [Note: Attorney Caroline Lewis added to party Credit Corp Solutions Inc(pty:dft).] (Lewis, Caroline)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/29 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Credit Corp Solutions Inc Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/22 6:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Credit Corp Solutions Inc Related [+] by Shanaequious Compton (With attachments) (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 01/22 5:36 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Tiffany Hill for Shanaequious Compton) by Shanaequious Compton (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Tue 01/21 3:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, changing case number to 25-cv-34-GKF-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Tue 01/21 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Shanaequious Compton to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Credit Corp Solutions Inc (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3141130) by Shanaequious Compton (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/21 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shanaequious Compton (Hill, Tiffany)
Related: [-]