Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:25-cv-00048
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:29 AM CST
Defendant
Alvaro Bedoya
in their official capacities as Commissioners of the Federal Trade Commission 600 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20580
Defendant
Lina Khan
Defendant
Rebecca Kelly Slaughter
Defendant
United States Federal Trade Commission
Plaintiff
Scott D Sheffield
Represented By
Joshua Davis Jones
Mckool Smith
contact info
Robert M Manley
Mckool Smith PC
contact info
Tyler Brandon Freeman
Mckool Smith
contact info
Jason Chad Nash
The Law Office Of Jason Nash PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 03/24 9:12 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties'7 Joint Motion to Stay Proceeding or, Alternatively, to Extend the FTCs Answer Deadline. Having reviewed the Motion the Court finds that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Consequently, it is ORDERED that this case is STAYED for ninety days. The Parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within seven days after the expiration of the stay, apprising the Court of the status of the case and requesting that this case be reopened. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case and remove it from the statistical records until further notice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/24/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed (Public Entry) Mon 03/24 10:47 AM
Case Stayed Per Order at Docket8 . (cea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Fri 03/21 5:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding or Alternatively, to Extend the FTC's Answer Deadline filed by Scott D Sheffield with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Manley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/23 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott D Sheffield Declaration of Service via Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested Upon All Defendants (Manley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 qcref Pittman Tue 01/21 4:51 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 4:50 PM
Summons issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wxc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 01/21 2:43 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Federal Trade Commission filed by Scott D Sheffield. (Manley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Lina Khan,
Att: 2 Summons to Rebecca Slaughter,
Att: 3 Summons to Alvaro Bedoya
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 2:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott D Sheffield. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Manley, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Scott D Sheffield. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15200821) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Manley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet