Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sheri Polster Chappell
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:25-cv-00052
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/27 9:16 AM
NOTICE Cancelling Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Case transferred to Tampa. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
19 19 transfer Division transfer out Thu 02/13 1:19 PM
TRANSFER to Tampa Division and assigned case number 8:25-cv-371-TPB-SPF. (LF)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order transferring case to another division Thu 02/13 12:55 PM
ORDER transferring case to Tampa Dvision. New Case Number is 8:25-cv-371-TPB-SPF. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2025. (LF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 notice Compliance notice Tue 02/11 11:59 AM
NOTICE of compliance re 12 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel) Modified on 2/11/2025 (JG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 misc Response to order to show cause Mon 02/10 12:58 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 15 Order filed by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 order Order Tue 02/04 9:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. 5). Under Local Rule 1.04(b), a party "must begin an action in the division to which the action is most directly connected or in which the action is most conveniently advanced." See also 28 U.S.C. § 1406. Only one of the four Plaintiffs has ties to the Fort Myers Division, and the other three have ties to the Tampa Division. Accordingly, Plaintiffs must SHOW CAUSE on or before February 10, 2025, why the Court should not transfer this case to the Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/4/2025. (BB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/31 2:59 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. DIAL: 1-650-479-3207, Access code: 2316 024 8769. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/30 2:07 PM
ORDER granting 10 and 11 motions for special admission of attorneys Joshua N. Drian and Douglas J. Smith. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/30/2025. (RCD) Modified on 1/30/2025 (RCD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/29 7:13 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joshua N. Drian; Douglas J. Smith Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fee Wed 01/29 11:31 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22961673 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua N. Drian. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fee Wed 01/29 11:34 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22961708 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas J. Smith. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 7:13 AM
MOTION for Douglas J. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (e-portal) (JK)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 7:12 AM
MOTION for Joshua N. Drian to appear pro hac vice by Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (e-portal) (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 01/27 5:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 01/27 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bezalel Adin Stern on behalf of Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote. Lead Counsel: Bezalel A. Stern. (Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 order Civil Action Order Fri 01/24 9:18 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/24/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 service Summons issued Thu 01/23 2:46 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Social Security Administration. (AM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/22 5:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Unior Capote, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Andrea Metz.(Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 12:15 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Joshua N. Drian and Douglas J. Smith of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/22 9:28 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:25-cv-52-SPC-NPM. (AA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of appearance Tue 01/21 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Steinberg on behalf of Andrea Metz, Irish Ellis, Latesia Reed, Unior Capote, Carolyn W. Colvin (Steinberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, Social Security Administration (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22931559). The plaintiff declines consent to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Unior Capote, Andrea Metz, Latesia Reed, Irish Ellis.(Stern, Bezalel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons