Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Lindsay S Griffin
Case #: 8:25-cv-00160
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:13 AM EST
Defendant
Nucor Steel Florida, Inc.
Represented By
Hillary L. Klein
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Eric R. Locker
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Gregory Alan Hearing
Bush Graziano Rice & Hearing, P.A.
contact info
Sacha Dyson
Bush, Graziano, Rice & Platter, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Deborah Brown
Represented By
Deborah C. Brown
Brown Law And Consulting, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Vance
Represented By
Edward Wickliffe Wimp
The Leach Firm
contact info
Anthony J. Hall
The Leach Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 04/22 2:05 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 7/11/2025, 10:00am before Deborah Brown, Esquire. (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 12:25 PM
ORDER appointing Deborah Brown as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for July 11, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/4/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 04/04 11:20 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 11, 2025, 10:00am before Deborah Brown, Esquire. (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/25 2:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the joint motion for extension of time to file notice of mediation. (Doc. # 28 ). The notice of mediation is now due April 4, 2025. The Court reiterates that it does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/25/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 03/25 1:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediation by Christopher Vance. (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/06 2:21 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Nucor Steel Florida, Inc..(Klein, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
26 26 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 8:33 AM
ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/4/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order Tue 03/04 8:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. 24 , no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/4/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 03/04 8:31 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the JUNE 2026 Trial Term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/19/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/4/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 02/27 7:27 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Nucor Steel Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nucor Corporation for Nucor Steel Florida, Inc... (Klein, Hillary)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Case Management Report Thu 02/27 7:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Klein, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/26 10:54 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR . (MSN) Modified on 2/26/2025 to edit docket text (LMW)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/26 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Hillary L. Klein of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 4:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric R. Locker must submit a "Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration" through PACER. As explained in the Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, failure to register for CM/ECF may result in the lawyer's termination from the docket, the lawyer's not receiving a copy of papers filed in the case, or the dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin on 2/25/2025. (Griffin, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 4:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hillary L. Klein must submit a "Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration" through PACER. As explained in the Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, failure to register for CM/ECF may result in the lawyer's termination from the docket, the lawyer's not receiving a copy of papers filed in the case, or the dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin on 2/25/2025. (Griffin, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 4:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Eric Locker to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23061182 for $150 by Nucor Steel Florida, Inc.. (Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 4:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Hillary A. Klein to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23061106 for $150 by Nucor Steel Florida, Inc.. (Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Mon 02/17 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sacha Dyson on behalf of Nucor Steel Florida, Inc. (Dyson, Sacha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 4:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. # 13 ). Response now due March 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/11/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 02/11 3:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Nucor Steel Florida, Inc.. (Hearing, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 order Order Fri 01/24 3:35 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 27, 2025, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/24/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons returned executed Fri 01/24 2:43 PM
RETURN of service executed on 1/23/2025 by Christopher Vance as to Nucor Steel Florida, Inc.. (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 8 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Christopher Vance. (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Christopher Vance. Related case(s): No (Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Wed 01/22 2:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Wed 01/22 10:15 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Nucor Steel Florida, Inc. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/21 4:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:25-cv-160-VMC-LSG. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against NUCOR STEEL FLORIDA, INC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22929918) filed by CHRISTOPHER VANCE.(Wimp, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Summons to be Issued