Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00054
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:33 AM EST
Defendant
Anderson Concrete Corp.
400 Frank Road
Columbus, OH 43207
Represented By
Graycen Marie Wood
contact info
Gary Steven Batke
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info
Defendant
Teamsters Local Union 284
555 East Rich Street
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Michael Allen Moses
Michael A. Moses, Attorney
contact info
D. James Petroff
Wentz, Mcinerney, Peifer & Petroff, LLC
contact info
Graycen Marie Wood
contact info
Jessica R Doogan
Wentz, Mcinerney, Peifer, & Petroff
contact info
Jonathan Carter Wentz
Barkan Meizlish Handelman Goodin Derose Wentz, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Loy
17680 Clarks Run Road
Mount Sterling, OH 43143
Represented By
Hallee Loy
Mallory Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 8:33 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeremy Loy Service of Initial Disclosures (Loy, Hallee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/13 3:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2025 is VACATED . Initial Disclosures due by 3/6/2025; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 3/20/2025; Discovery due by 10/31/2025; Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2025; Primary Expert due by 7/1/2025; Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2025; Settlement Demand due by 7/15/2025; Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/30/2025; Case is referred to Mediation in 8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/13/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 02/12 1:21 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Anderson Concrete Corp.. (Wood, Graycen)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 12:38 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Teamsters Local Union 284. (Petroff, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by D. James Petroff for Defendant Teamsters Local Union 284 (Petroff, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 misc State Court Record Mon 02/03 12:01 PM
State Court Record. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica R. Doogan for Defendant Teamsters Local Union 284 (Doogan, Jessica)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Carter Wentz for Defendant Teamsters Local Union 284 (Wentz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/28 11:23 AM
ANSWER to3 Complaint filed by Anderson Concrete Corp.. (Wood, Graycen)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/28 11:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Anderson Concrete Corp. on 1/27/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. (Loy, Hallee)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/28 11:27 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Teamsters Local Union 284 answer due 2/12/2025 per5 (Stipulation) (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 01/27 9:39 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Teamsters Local Union 284. (Moses, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/27 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Jeremy Loy against Anderson Concrete Corp. and Teamsters Local Union 284 (kk2)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anderson Concrete Corp.. (Wood, Graycen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas for Franklin County, Ohio, case number 24CV009667 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10335610), filed by Teamsters Local Union 284, Anderson Concrete Corp.. (Wood, Graycen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings