Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 2:25-cv-02031
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Case in other court:District Court of Leavenworth County, Kansas, LV-2024-CV-000342
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:17 AM CST
Defendant
Mark Hastings
Represented By
Emma Halling
Lathrop Gpm
contact info
Richard N. Bien
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Robert J. Haupt
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Plaintiff
Yoni Grunbaum
Represented By
Robert A. Hammeke
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Treitel
Represented By
Robert A. Hammeke
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Hammeke
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
Mad Family Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Hammeke
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
SIYO Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Hammeke
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2025
/2025. (kas)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and finding as moot 15 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Concurrent Proceeding. This case is hereby stayed pending resolution of the Missouri state-court action. The parties shall notify the Court when the Missouri state court action has concluded or file a joint status report if the action remains pending on August 18, 2025. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/16

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Stay Case Wed 04/16 11:03 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and finding as moot15 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Concurrent Proceeding. This case is hereby stayed pending resolution of the Missouri state-court action. The parties shall notify the Court when the Missouri state court action has concluded or file a joint status report if the action remains pending on August 18, 2025. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/16/2025. (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/09 2:36 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Nathan Treitel re15 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Concurrent Proceeding. (Hammeke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/02 9:06 AM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Mark Hastings re15 Motion to Stay. (Haupt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Motions No Longer Referred Mon 03/24 1:49 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 15 MOTION to Stay Case. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ccr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 motion Stay Case Fri 03/21 3:21 PM
MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiffs 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Nathan Treitel Related [+] (Hammeke, Robert)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 order Order Mon 03/17 1:08 PM
ORDER. The undersigned Magistrate Judge communicated with counsel, via letter dated February 26, 2025, regarding deferred scheduling in this case. Having received no response, the Rule 16 conference will be postponed until after the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 8) has been decided by the District Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/17/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ccr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/11 1:22 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Mark Hastings re:8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Haupt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Missouri Opposition
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 2:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Nathan Treitel identifying None as corporate parent . (Hammeke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/25 4:47 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Nathan Treitel re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hammeke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
10 10 14 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 02/04 3:11 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mark Hastings(Bien, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
9 9 misc Designation of Place of Trial Tue 02/04 3:09 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Nathan Treitel - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hammeke, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/04 3:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mark Hastings (Bien, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/29 2:09 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Mark Hastings. Defendant Mark Hastings is to answer or otherwise plead by 2/4/2025. Counsel is reminded of the requirements of Local Rule 6.1(a) and encouraged to allow no less than 3 days to consider extension in the future. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/29/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ccr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/27 2:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Mark Hastings Related [+] (Halling, Emma)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Thu 01/23 4:35 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nathan Treitel, 1000 Hillcrest Drive PropCo, LLC, SIYO Holdings, LLC, Mad Family Holdings, LLC, Yoni Grunbaum upon Mark Hastings served on 12/31/2024. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN LEAVENWORTH COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 01/15/2025; See Doc. [3-1, page 199] for pleading) (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 01/22 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (jsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Defendant's Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Mark Hastings (Halling, Emma)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc State Court Records Tue 01/21 4:40 PM
STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Leavenworth County, Kansas.(Halling, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Records
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/21 4:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Mark Hastings. (Halling, Emma)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Leavenworth County, Kansas, case number LV-2024-CV-000342 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6566419.), filed by Mark Hastings.(Halling, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Amended Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal