South Carolina District Court
Case #: 6:25-cr-00042
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2025 2:13 AM EST
Defendant
Nigel Craig-Jackson (1)
Represented By
Lora Collins Blanchard
Federal Public Defender'S Office (gvle)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William J Watkins, Jr
Us Attorneys Office (gville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/22/2025 2:36 AM EST
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
2 2 SEALED INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Nigel Craig-Jackson (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (jens, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
5 5 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF Indictment WARRANT as to Nigel Craig-Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/14/2025.(jens, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Nigel Craig-Jackson for from time to time as needed from the Greenville County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/14/2025.(jens, )
Related: [-]
8 8 STANDING ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Nigel Craig-Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/14/2025.(jens, )
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Nigel Craig-Jackson Arraignment set for 1/30/2025 09:45 AM in Greenville #3100, Carroll A Campbell Jr Courthouse, 250 East North St, Greenville before Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald. (jens, )
Related: [-]