Colorado District Court
Judge:Kathryn A Starnella
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:25-cv-00214
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 2:50 AM MST
Defendant
AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado
Defendant
Charlie Madnikoff
Plaintiff
Jessica Susanne Revello
7044 Wheeler Peak Drive
Carson City, NV 87901


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Fri 05/02 1:43 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 May 2025. Accordingly, based on the foregoing and the entire record in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel9 is DENIED without prejudice at this time.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 04/23 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 23 April 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Continue May 30, 2025 Scheduling Conference26 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for May 30, 2025, at 12:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to July 2, 2025,1 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than June 25, 2025, the parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Continue Wed 04/23 10:34 AM
MOTION to Continue May 30, 2025 Scheduling Conference by Defendants AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado, Charlie Madnikoff. (McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 3 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 1:55 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND ADVISEMENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/23/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2025 12:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 4/17/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/11 4:39 PM
ORDER Referring Case to United States Magistrate Judge Case Kathryn A. Starnella, by Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/11/2025. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-214-KAS (angar, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/11 9:47 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Charlie Madnikoff All parties consent.. (McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 9:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Michael G. McKinnon added to party Charlie Madnikoff(pty:dft) by Charlie Madnikoff.(McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
21 21 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 03/31 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Susanne Revello. Charlie Madnikoff served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 misc Reply Wed 03/19 2:04 PM
REPLY to17 Defendant AutoNation's Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello.(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 03/19 8:21 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado All parties consent.. (McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 10:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/13 9:55 AM
Defendant AutoNation's ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Michael G. McKinnon added to party AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado(pty:dft) by AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado.(McKinnon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Fri 03/07 4:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Susanne Revello. AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 02/04 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 11:11 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello - Plaintiff party consents. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 12:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re1 Complaint for Service of Process (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Service Forms
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 10:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, 11 Order Referring Motion to Jessica Susanne Revello at 7044 Wheeler Peak Drive Carson City, NV 87901. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Referring Motion Mon 01/27 10:44 AM
MEMORANDUM: re9 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Jessica Susanne Revello. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/27/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 10:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/27/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Mon 01/27 10:02 AM
MOTION For Appointment Of Counsel by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 01/24 3:00 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/24 2:59 PM
ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Therefore, the case will be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c). Accordingly, it is ordered that this case be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 1/24/2025. [This case has been drawn to District Judge S. Kato Crews and Magistrate Kathryn A. Starnella. All further proceedings shall be designated as 25-cv-214-SKC] (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 01/22 10:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915. It is ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is granted. The Motion to Appear via Webex (ECF No.3 ) is denied without prejudice as premature because this case is currently under initial review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1 and there are no scheduled hearings, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 1/22/2025.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 01/21 4:29 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 4:29 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Under F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello (agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Tue 01/21 4:26 PM
MOTION to Appear via WebEx by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello. (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/21 4:26 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jessica Susanne Revello. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against AutoNation USA Broadway of Littleton, Colorado, Charlie Madnikoff, filed by Jessica Susanne Revello.(agryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Request,
Att: 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons,
Att: 4 Subpoena Request,
Att: 5 Envelope