Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Glen H Davidson
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 1:25-cv-00010
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 4:19 AM CST
Defendant
Denmar Services, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Ross
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Martin Joseph Regimbal
The Kullman Firm - Columbus
contact info
Connor Curtis
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Defendant
IUE-CWA
Defendant
John Does 1-20
Plaintiff
Malla L. Pulliam, III
Represented By
DeMoreo Reddick
Reddick Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 8:57 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IUE-CWA Local 83370 . (Best, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by IUE-CWA Local 83370. (Best, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Connor Curtis on behalf of Denmar Services, Inc. (Curtis, Connor)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of Denmar Services, Inc. (Ross, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/16 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Henry Best, III on behalf of IUE-CWA Local 83370 (Best, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Tue 04/15 12:06 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Substitute Party. IUE-CWA Local 83370 added. IUE-CWA terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/15/2025. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 motion Substitute Party Mon 04/14 8:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Party and for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by IUE-CWA. (Hussey, William)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Mon 04/14 12:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to IUE-CWA. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/10 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William H. Hussey on behalf of IUE-CWA (Hussey, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DeMoreo Reddick on behalf of Malla L. Pulliam, III IUE-CWA served on 2/19/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] ddick, DeMoreo
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Tue 03/25 11:01 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to IUE-CWA. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 11:52 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Paul Ross; granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Connor Curtis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/6/2025. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 2:34 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Connor Curtis,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2502075) by Denmar Services, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] gimbal, Martin
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 2:22 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul Ross,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2502065) by Denmar Services, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] gimbal, Martin
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 10:46 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Denmar Services, Inc. . Related [+]
Related: [-] gimbal, Martin
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 10:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Denmar Services, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] gimbal, Martin
Monday, February 24, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Mon 02/24 4:57 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Denmar Services, Inc., IUE-CWA. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Denmar Services, Inc., IUE-CWA. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/21 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2482226, filed by Malla L. Pulliam, III. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-EEOC Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-EEOC Charge-IUE-CWA,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-EEOC Right to Sue Letter-IUE-CWA,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Tue 01/21 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
Related: [-]