Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:25-cv-60118
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 5:15 AM EST
Defendant
HUI YANG GE
Plaintiff
XUFANG PAN
Represented By
June (Hua) Zhou
Law Office Of June Zhou
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 05/01 11:13 AM
ORDER denying6 Motion for Order to Show Cause. DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/30/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
6 6 motion Show Cause Sat 04/19 12:14 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause by XUFANG PAN. (Zhou, June (Hua))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/19 1:34 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in re: Service of summons and complaint. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 misc Appendix Wed 01/22 7:07 PM
APPENDIX to1 Complaint by XUFANG PAN (Zhou, June (Hua))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/21 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to HUI YANG GE. (cwc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 01/21 2:55 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Xufang PAN against HUI YANG GE. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18130823, filed by XUFANG PAN.(Zhou, June (Hua))
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)