Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00019
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (Standard) Fri 03/07 3:05 PM
NOTICE: Defendant's counsel was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #10 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Dft's counsel shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by email correspondence. (sej)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 02/14 2:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/10/2025. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 1/12/2026. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/10/2025; and from Defendant by 8/11/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 5/12/2025; as to Defendant is 6/12/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 2/12/2026. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/14/25. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Fri 02/14 8:59 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Nicholas Wallace. Dft appeared by atty John Hamilton. The11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as mediator. Atty Hamilton to notify mediator by letter, copy to atty Wallace. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/6/2025. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas F Wallace on behalf of Nicholas A. Handley (Wallace, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Nicholas A. Handley (Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 02/11 5:09 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Thu 01/30 1:21 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Thu 01/30 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time.(mr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/30 9:52 AM
***Corporate Disclosure Deadline terminated. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D Hamilton on behalf of Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing Inc. (Hamilton, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/28 4:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing Inc.. (Hardman, Lyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S Kleber on behalf of Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing Inc. (Kleber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/24 9:57 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Defendant, Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing, Inc. is ordered to file its corporate disclosure statement in compliance with FRCP 7.1 and General Order 2023-06 by 2/6/2025. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/22 11:58 AM
**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Tue 01/21 5:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Filing in State Court . (Hardman, Lyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5793577.) from Allen Superior, Cause No. 02D02-2412-CT-000800, filed by Peterman Heating Cooling.(Hardman, Lyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/22 12:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing Inc. Answer filed in the Allen Superior, Case No. 02D02-2412-CT-800. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 cmp State Court Complaint Wed 01/22 12:25 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Peterman Heating, Cooling and Plumbing Inc., filed by Nicholas A. Handley. Complaint filed in the Allen Superior, Case no. 02D02-2412-CT-800. (nhc)
Related: [-]