U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Judge:Zachary N Somers
Case #: 1:25-cv-00112
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1491 Tucker Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 6:04 AM EST
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Reta Emma Bezak
Doj-Civ
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
LEIDOS, INC.
Represented By
Paul Farid Khoury
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NIGHTWING INTELLIGENCE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
Daniel R. Forman
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/22/2025 8:20 AM EST
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (HLS) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10146422) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by NIGHTWING INTELLIGENCE SOLUTIONS, LLC. Answer due by 3/24/2025.(vds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
2 2 **SEALED** MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by NIGHTWING INTELLIGENCE SOLUTIONS, LLC. Service: 01/21/2025. Response due by 2/4/2025. (vds)
Related: [-]
3 3 **SEALED** MOTION for Protective Order, filed by NIGHTWING INTELLIGENCE SOLUTIONS, LLC. Service: 01/21/2025. Response due by 2/4/2025. (vds)
Related: [-]
4 4 **SEALED**Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by NIGHTWING INTELLIGENCE SOLUTIONS, LLC. Service: 01/21/2025.(vds)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Zachary N. Somers. (vds)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Reta Emma Bezak for USA . (Bezak, Reta)
Related: [-]
8 8 STATUS REPORT ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for proceedings in this case, including the expiration date of any voluntary stay by 12:00 PM EST on January 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (jn) Service on parties made.
Related: [-]