South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00390
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 5:23 AM EST
Defendant
Coastal Pediatric Associates PA
Plaintiff
Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Represented By
Merritt G Abney
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough (cha)
contact info
Ashley Nicole Hawkins
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough (cha)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 05/02 11:18 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING Setting Hearing on Motion 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Coastal Pediatric Associates, P.A. : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2025 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to personally serve the Defendant with a copy of this Order, and with all other documents in the Record attached as an exhibit thereto, on or before May 15, 2025. Plaintiff shall file the corresponding proof of service with the Court no later than May 22, 2025. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/2/2025. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 10:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC re9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Coastal Pediatric Associates, P.A. (Abney, Merritt)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/20 9:59 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Coastal Pediatric Associates, P.A. by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/3/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Abney, Merritt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Damages,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Judgment
8 8 misc Affidavit Thu 03/20 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of David M. Hull of Damages of Merck Sharp & Dohme by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. (Abney, Merritt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 02/26 9:27 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Coastal Pediatric Associates PA per6 (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default Tue 02/25 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byMerck Sharp & Dohme LLC.(Abney, Merritt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 02/04 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. Coastal Pediatric Associates PA served on 1/29/2025, answer due 2/19/2025.(Abney, Merritt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Coastal Pediatric Associates, P.A.
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 10:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Coastal Pediatric Associates PA. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 01/22 10:16 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Coastal Pediatric Associates PA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12216218.), filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. Service due by 4/21/2025(sshe, )
Related: [-]