Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:25-cv-00205
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 5:16 AM EST
Defendant
Baltimore City Dept. of Public Works
Defendant
EEOC Baltimore Field Office
Plaintiff
Lamar A. Williams
P.O. Box 115
Perry Hall, MD 21128


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/09 3:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Lamar A. Williams. U.S. Attorney General served on 4/1/2025.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 04/07 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamar A. Williams. EEOC Baltimore Field Office served (U.S. Attorney) on 4/1/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Green Card
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamar A. Williams. EEOC Baltimore Field Office served on 3/26/2025, answer due 4/16/2025.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 03/21 1:35 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to EEOC Baltimore Field Office, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/em USMS 3/21/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Baltimore City Dept. of Public Works served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 03/04 1:25 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore City Dept. of Public Works. (c/em USMS 3/4/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 1:23 PM
NOTICE Summons and USM form for Defendant EEOC Baltimore Field Office re1 Complaint by Lamar A. Williams (U.S. Atty and USAG forms not submitted ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Form for EEOC
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/10 12:43 PM
ORDER granting2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order in which to complete the U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk together with any additional summonses. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/10/2025. (c/m p as directed 2/10/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Form,
Att: 2 Summons
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/28 9:47 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 01/22 2:27 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Lamar A. Williams. (cc/em to P on 1/22/25- ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 01/22 2:26 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Lamar A. Williams. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/22 2:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamar A. Williams.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Baltimore City Dept. of Public Works, EEOC Baltimore Field Office, filed by Lamar A. Williams.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons