Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Case #: 8:25-cv-00022
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 3:25 AM CST
Defendant
Federal Government
Defendant
State of Nebraska
Plaintiff
Cameron Chrisp
2121 N. 27th St. 12
Lincoln, NE 68503

GPO Jan 28 2025
2/27/2025: Check for MIFP or payment.) Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form AO240) (MKR)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $405.00 fees to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for
GPO Mar 07 2025
e John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this Court's orders. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judg

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 order Judgment - Pro Se Fri 03/07 11:16 AM
JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order5 entered on this date. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases
5 5 1 pgs order Memorandum and Order Fri 03/07 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this Court's orders. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
utility Remark - Public Fri 02/14 3:09 PM
Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen electronic filing request received from pro se plaintiff Cameron Chrisp. Access granted on 2/14/25. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Memorandum and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines Tue 01/28 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $405.00 fees to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/27/2025: Check for MIFP or payment.) Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form AO240) (MKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order - Pro Se GO 2025-01 Wed 01/22 11:03 AM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2025-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(NMW)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) Wed 01/22 11:00 AM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (NMW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Wed 01/22 10:51 AM
RESTRICTED COMPLAINT against Federal Government, State of Nebraska filed on behalf ofCameron Crisp. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (NMW)
Related: [-]