Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:25-cv-00067
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 3:29 AM CST
Defendant
Stephen Bulboff
Defendant
Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC
Plaintiff
Zavian Rolando Valdez
Represented By
Theodore George Baroody
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info
Sharon Hise
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info
David W Carstens
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ZZ Tech, LLC
Represented By
Theodore George Baroody
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info
Sharon Hise
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info
David W Carstens
Carstens, Allen & Gourley, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
16 16 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Thu 04/24 9:59 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 5/30/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/24/2025. (baf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 04/18 4:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stephen Bulboff.(Pinkus, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration of Stephen Bulboff,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 11:19 AM
ANSWER and Separate and/or Affirmative Defenses to1 Complaint by Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC.(tkd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 04/18 11:19 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (tkd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 04/02 6:26 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC answer is now due 4/18/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(baf)
Related: [-]
12 12 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 04/02 4:01 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC. Summons originally served on 02/12/2025. Agreed new answer date is 04/18/2025.(Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 04/02 10:16 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Stephen Bulboff answer is now due 4/18/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(baf)
Related: [-]
10 10 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 04/02 10:07 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC on behalf of Defendant Stephen Bulboff. Summons originally served on 03/21/2025. Agreed new answer date is 04/18/2025.(Baroody, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/12 1:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC. Stephen Bulboff served on 2/28/2025. (Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/12 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC. Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC served on 2/13/2025. (Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 02/21 12:52 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC answer is now due 4/4/2025; Stephen Bulboff answer is now due 4/4/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(baf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 02/20 5:26 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC. Summons originally served on 02/12/2025. Agreed new answer date is 04/04/2025.(Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Stephen Bulboff, Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC.(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Coleman
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 02/06 3:06 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (baf)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 02/06 10:18 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint. Report in Compliance with Local Rule CV-4(a) . (Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 01/23 10:15 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 01/22 4:12 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC (Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Stephen Bulboff, Coleman Hanna Carwash Systems, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10634789.), filed by Zavian Rolando Valdez, ZZ Tech, LLC.(Carstens, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/23 10:15 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (CLC)
Related: [-]