Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 5:25-cv-04005
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1681 Education: Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 4:33 AM CST
Defendant
Tina F. Botts
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Christopher B. Carey
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Dempsey-Swopes
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Emily Grant
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Defendant
JuliAnn Mazachek
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Washburn University Board of Regents
Represented By
Marc B. Fried
Washburn University School Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ahmir J. Kenyatta
E-Filing & ECF Notifications 632 Tuttle Creek Blvd. #1048
Manhattan, KS 66502


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/07 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Ahmir J. Kenyatta (Kenyatta, Ahmir)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/10 9:43 AM
***Per 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Civil Case Terminated. (jal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. Danielle Dempsey-Swopes waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. Washburn University Board of Regents waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. JuliAnn Mazachek waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. Emily Grant waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. Christopher B. Carey waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca) Modified filing date on 1/30/2025 (ca)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/30 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. Tina F. Botts waiver sent on 1/23/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
9 9 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 01/29 10:20 AM
ORDER denying4 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Declaration of Good Faith Efforts to Obtain Counsel. Plaintiff's request for an order finding he is eligible to proceed IFP and appointing counsel are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's request for an order compelling the parties to consider ADR is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 1/29/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Order Mon 01/27 3:49 PM
ORDER denying7 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Require Parties to Consider ADR. This case was filed on January 22, 2025. While the docket reflects that summonses have been issued, there is no indication that Defendants have been served and no Defendant has appeared in this case. Consistent with the District's form scheduling order, the Court addresses the issue of mediation during the scheduling conference, which the Court has not set because Defendants have not been served. For these reasons, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion. The Court will take up the issue of mediation in due course at a scheduling conference. Plaintiff need not refile a motion requesting that the Court order mediation before that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 1/27/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2025
7 7 4 pgs motion Order Sun 01/26 11:56 PM
MOTION for Order TO REQUIRE PARTIES TO CONSIDER ADR AND FOR REFERRAL OF CASE TO PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION by Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta Related [+] (Kenyatta, Ahmir)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
6 6 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Sun 01/26 10:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta.(Kenyatta, Ahmir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Grade Distribution,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B - University Threat to Sanction Plaintiff,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C - University GC Aligned on Remedy with Plaintiff,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit D - University Admin Refusing Remedy,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E - ADA Request Denial for 1-1 Support,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit F - Law School Explaining 30 Credits Required to Transfer,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit Exhibit G - POTUS EO on Free Speech,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit H - LARW II Registration,
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit List Exhibit Index
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 misc Financial Affidavit Fri 01/24 1:46 PM
(NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta. (ca)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 01/24 12:51 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel AND DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH EFFORTS TO OBTAIN COUNSEL by Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta Related [+] (Kenyatta, Ahmir)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Jury Demand Wed 01/22 3:47 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL and DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY filed by Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta - trial to be held in Topeka. (jsh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/22 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta. (jsh)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $405, Payment Receipt Number 200001920.), filed by Ahmir J. Kenyatta. (jsh)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 01/22 3:47 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Ahmir J. Kenyatta is a registered pro se participant with e-filing & ECF notifications. (gw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 01/22 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (jsh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 4:10 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tina F. Botts, Christopher B. Carey, Danielle Dempsey-Swopes, Emily Grant, JuliAnn Mazachek, Washburn University Board of Regents (issued and returned to pro se plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
Related: [-]