California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:25-cv-00180
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 2:17 AM PST
Defendant
Devon Barbara
Defendant
Celsius Holdings Inc.
Defendant
Emily Tanner
Defendant
Erika Wheaton
Plaintiff
Mariana Dubreu
Represented By
Keith L. Gibson
Keith Gibson Law, P.C.
contact info
William Michael Aron
Law Office Of William M. Aron
contact info
Bogdan Enica
Keith Gibson Law P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
35 35 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/22 11:25 AM
ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani: granting34 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Tully APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Devon Barbara, Celsius Holdings Inc., Emily Tanner, Erika Wheaton, designating Rachel E.K. Lowe as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 05/21 2:58 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Tully to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Devon Barbara, Celsius Holdings Inc., Emily Tanner, Erika Wheaton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39754523) filed by Defendants Devon Barbara, Celsius Holdings Inc., Emily Tanner, Erika Wheaton. (Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
33 33 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/13 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Devon Barbara, Celsius Holdings Inc., Emily Tanner, Erika Wheaton, (Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 05/13 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
31 31 50 pgs motion Dismiss Case Mon 05/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint or, In the Alternative Transfer) filed by Defendants Devon Barbara, Celsius Holdings Inc., Emily Tanner, Erika Wheaton. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. (Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Suzanne Goldberg,
Att: 2 Declaration of Emily Tanner,
Att: 3 Declaration of Devon Windsor,
Att: 4 Declaration of Erica Wheaton,
Att: 5 Declaration of Brooke H. Bolender,
Att: 6 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
30 30 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 03/27 4:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), TO SPECIALLY SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE MOTION, AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES FOR RESPONSIVE BRIEFING29 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before May 12, 2025. 2. Plaintiff's Opposition is due on or before June 12, 2025. 3. Defendants' Reply is due on or before June 26, 2025. 4. Defendants' responsive motion shall be set for hearing on July 14, 2025. 5. Defendants may file a consolidated brief responding to Plaintiff's Complaint of up to thirty-five (35) pages in length, excluding the caption, indices, exhibits, and signature pages. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 03/26 4:22 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Emily Tanner answer now due 5/12/2025; Erika Wheaton answer now due 5/12/2025; Devon Barbara answer now due 5/12/2025; Celsius Holdings Inc. answer now due 5/12/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Emily Tanner; Erika Wheaton; Devon Barbara; Celsius Holdings Inc..(Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Devon Barbara(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Celsius Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Emily Tanner(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Erika Wheaton(pty:dft))(Lowe, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
28 28 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/19 7:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. upon Emily Tanner waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Bolender, Brooke. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/19 7:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. upon Erika Wheaton waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Bolender, Brooke. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/19 7:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Celsius Holdings Inc.. upon Celsius Holdings Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Bolender, Brooke. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
25 25 service Summons Issued Sat 03/15 10:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Celsius Holdings Inc. aka Celsius Products Holdings Inc. Celsius Holdings Inc. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
24 24 notice Summons Request Fri 03/14 1:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 service Summons Issued Thu 03/13 3:57 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Emily Tanner. (lom)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Issued Thu 03/13 3:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Erika Wheaton. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 notice Summons Request Wed 03/12 6:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Summons Request Wed 03/12 6:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/12 5:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. upon Devon Barbara waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Devon Barbara. (Enica, Bogdan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 02/19 4:30 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:25-cv-00180 MRA(SPx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 9:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: finding as moot12 ; granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Keith L. Gibson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu, designating William M. Aron as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 02/10 9:34 AM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith L. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/29/2025, Receipt No. 39003781) filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 12:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: finding as moot10 ; granting13 Non-Resident Attorney Bogdan Enica APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu, designating William M. Aron as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Fri 01/31 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith L. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39003781)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application not signed by local counsel. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 01/30 12:57 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bogdan Enica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/27/2025, Receipt No. 38984870) filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 01/29 1:18 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith L. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39003781) filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Tue 01/28 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bogdan Enica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38984870)10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 01/27 1:00 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bogdan Enica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38984870) filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order G-64 Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/24 9:24 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu, (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 01/23 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bogdan Enica. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 01/23 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Keith L. Gibson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/23 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 01/23 4:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 01/23 4:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 01/23 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 01/22 5:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Aron, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/22 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38957833 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Mariana Dubreu. (Attorney William Michael Aron added to party Mariana Dubreu(pty:pla))(Aron, William)
Related: [-]