New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:24-cv-08871
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 6:01 AM EST
Defendant
Shenzhen Best Leather Handbags Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shop1103807226 Store
Defendant
Shop1103477230 Store
Defendant
Shop1103356002 Store
Defendant
Shop1102985036 Store
Defendant
Shop1102771569 Store
Defendant
Shop1102753315 Store
Defendant
Shop1102751879 Store
Defendant
Shop1102571060 Store
Defendant
Shenzhen Wade Culture Communication Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Kebixiong Clothing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shop1103949229 Store
Defendant
Shenzhen Baoan District Xinmeili Jewelry Store
Defendant
SDFBK Official Stor
Defendant
Quzhou Cindy Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Peeqi Boutique (Dongguan) Co,ltd
Defendant
Okal Light Store
Defendant
Mogra Store
Defendant
Ltd, Jinjiang Gongxia Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Zhuji Chengnan Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jin Xidun (Xiamen) International Trade Co.
Defendant
Zhangzhou Changtai Naimi Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Yudian Clothes Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Xinting Jewelry Co., Ltd
Defendant
Yiwu Shulong E-Commerce Firm
Defendant
Yiwu Shanmei Arts And Gifts Co., Ltd
Defendant
Yiwu Qiudun Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Ouze Clothing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Liyi Commodity Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Jingzi Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Hongmao Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
YIWU QIANHENG JEWELRY CO.,LTD
Defendant
Xiamen Sky Pigeon Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Xiamen Jiajiaming Leather Goods Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Xiamen Deya Global Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Xiamen Boskims Garments Co., Ltd
Defendant
Wuhan Mantian Xingchen Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
UNIZERA WM Store Store
Defendant
Top Luxury Bags Vip Store
Defendant
The Peach Bag Store
Defendant
Taizhou Luqiao Fengdao Trading Co., Ltd
Defendant
TRAFZA First Store
Defendant
Shop912730081 Store
Defendant
Dongguan YSYS Original Design Fashion Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Mingshen Jewelry Co., Ltd
Defendant
Guangzhou Guoxin Hardware Products Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Chuangyimei Industry And Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou BHL Fashion Co.,ltd
Defendant
Gansu Fanxi Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
GREENFOREST Store
Defendant
Fuzhou Reliable E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongyang Shengfeng Clothing Co., Ltd
Defendant
Dongguan Yunxun Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Yuantu Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jiangyin DH Garments Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Xuanzhige Apparel Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Wisrise Garment Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Jieli Apparel Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Dongguan Humen Limenglang Garment Factory
Defendant
Dongguan Dafeng Garment Co., Ltd
Defendant
Dongguan Cainan Clothing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Chengdu Meibailong Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd
Defendant
C-BAG Store
Defendant
Burminsa Official Store
Defendant
Beijing Onward Fashion Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Huizhou Qian Qian Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Huixian Qiange Clothing Co., Ltd
Defendant
Hengshui Jiankang Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Henan Jiheng Technology Co., Ltd
Defendant
Hefei Angels Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Hebei The Best Information Technology Consulting Co., Ltd
Defendant
Hangzhou Yeyinglong E-Commerce Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Haifeng Meilong Town Shengbairui Jewelry Factory
Defendant
Guangzhou Yutong Leather Goods Co. Ltd
Defendant
Guangzhou Yazhi Jewelry Manufacturer
Defendant
Guangzhou Yapai Leather Co., Ltd
Defendant
Guangzhou Xiangcheng Leather Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Sunny(day) Leather Goods Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Shanhe Clothing Co., Ltd
Defendant
Guangzhou Senyisen Leather Goods Firm
Defendant
Guangzhou Phoenix Clothing Limited Company
Defendant
Guangzhou Oudina Clothing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou New Nice Jewelry Co.ltd
Movant
Airwallex Hong Kong Limited
Represented By
Anna Faye Nabutovsky
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello PC
contact info
Karen R. King
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Loewe, S.A.
Represented By
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Grace A. Rawlins
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Gabriela N. Nastasi
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Danielle S. Futterman
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 02/01/2025
Defendant
Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd.,
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 01/10/2025
Defendant
Guangzhou Nuowa E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 01/10/2025


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
48 48 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/15 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Loewe, S.A. ("Loewe" or "Plaintiff"), by its undersigned attorneys, hereby gives notice of dismissal of all claims against Defendant Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd. in the above-captioned action, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed its claims against against Defendant Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd. with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the names of Defendant Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd. from the caption of this case. SO ORDERED. Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/15 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 47 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
47 47 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd.. Document filed by Loewe, S.A.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
46 46 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 03/21 9:42 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on45 LETTER withdrawing32 Motion for Attorney Fees. ENDORSEMENT: The March 20, 2025 request by Non-Party Airwallex (Hong Kong) Limited to withdraw its motion for attorney's fees and costs, Dkt. No. 45, is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/20/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Letter Thu 03/20 5:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Karen R. King dated March 20, 2025 re: Withdrawal of Motion for Fees and Costs (Dkt. 32). Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 03/07 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Loewe, S.A. ("Loewe" or "Plaintiff"), by its undersigned attorneys, hereby gives notice of dismissal of all claims against Defendant Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd. & Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd. in the above-captioned action, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed its claims against against Defendant Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd. and Defendant Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd. with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A) (i). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the names of Defendant Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd. and Defendant Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd. from the caption of this case. Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd. and Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/7/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/07 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
43 43 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/06 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd., Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd.. Document filed by Loewe, S.A.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
42 42 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/06 10:29 AM
ORDER granting41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. Plaintiff's application for an extension of time to file its opposition to the motion for fees and costs filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited ("Airwallex"), Dkt. No. 41, is granted. Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than March 21, 2025; AirWallex's reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Plaintiff's opposition. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 41.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/6/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 10:29 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Responses due by 3/21/2025 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/05 3:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply for Airwallex's Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Danielle S. Futterman dated March 5, 2025. Document filed by Loewe, S.A...(Futterman, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/18 9:30 AM
ORDER granting39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. Plaintiff's application for an extension of time to file its opposition to the motion for fees and costs filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited ("Airwallex"), Dkt. No. 39, is granted. Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than March 7, 2025; AirWallex's reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Plaintiff's opposition. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 39. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/14/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/14 10:55 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply for Airwallex's Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Danielle S. Futterman dated February 14, 2025. Document filed by Loewe, S.A...(Futterman, Danielle)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/18 9:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Responses due by 3/7/2025 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/10 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Faye Nabutovsky on behalf of Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(Nabutovsky, Anna)
Related: [-]
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 02/10 12:58 PM
ORDER with respect to32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff's oppositionis due by no later than February 21, 2025; AirWallex Hong Kong's reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Plaintiff's opposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/10/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/10 12:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Responses due by 2/21/2025 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
36 36 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 2:14 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Airwallex (Cayman) Limited for Airwallex Hong Kong Limited. Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
35 35 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 02/05 1:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs . . Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 02/05 1:30 PM
DECLARATION of Altin H. Sila in Support re:32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 02/05 1:25 PM
DECLARATION of Karen R. King in Support re:32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs .. Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- TRO filed in Case No. 24-CV-8871 (GHW),
Att: 2 Exhibit B- List of emails that attached court orders received from Epstein Drangel,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Email exchanges with Epstein Drangel from August and September 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- 12.9.2024 email chain between Airwallexs counsel and plaintiffs counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Morvillo Abramowitz's Bill for services rendered to Airwallex Hong Kong
32 32 motion Attorney Fees Wed 02/05 1:08 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs . Document filed by Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen R. King on behalf of Airwallex Hong Kong Limited..(King, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/03 9:23 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
30 30 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/03 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Loewe, S.A. ("Loewe" or "Plaintiff"), by its undersigned attorneys, hereby gives notice of dismissal of all claims against Defendant Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd. in the above-captioned action, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed all claims against against Defendant Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd. with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the names of Defendant Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd. from the caption of this case. SO ORDERED. Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/1/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/31 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd.. Document filed by Loewe, S.A.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 01/24 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Loewe, S.A. ("Loewe" or "Plaintiff"), by its undersigned attorneys, hereby gives notice of dismissal of all claims against Defendant Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd. and Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd. in the above-captioned action, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed all claims against against Defendants Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd. and Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd. with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the names of Defendants Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd. and Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd. from the caption of this case. SO ORDERED. Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd. and Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/24/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 01/24 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Loewe, S.A. ("Loewe" or "Plaintiff"), by its undersigned attorneys, hereby gives notice of dismissal of all claims against Defendants Guangzhou Nuowa E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd. and Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd. in the above-captioned action, without prejudice, and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed all claims against against Defendants Guangzhou Nuowa ECommerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd. and Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the following names from the caption of this case: Guangzhou Nuowa E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd. and Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd. SO ORDERED. Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd., Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd.,, Guangzhou Nuowa E-Commerce Co., Ltd. and Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/24/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/24 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/23 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd., Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd. Document filed by Loewe, S.A.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/23 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Guangzhou Nuowa E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Qiaoyi Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Shengming Yuanying Trading Co., Ltd., Xiamen Zeyixin Garment Co., Ltd.,. Document filed by Loewe, S.A.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 01/23 1:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Loewe, S.A...(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Certificate of Service Complaints Thu 01/23 1:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Beijing Onward Fashion Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Burminsa Official Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; C-BAG Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Chengdu Meibailong Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Cainan Clothing Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Dafeng Garment Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Humen Limenglang Garment Factory served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Jieli Apparel Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Wisrise Garment Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Xuanzhige Apparel Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan YSYS Original Design Fashion Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Yuantu Industrial Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Dongguan Yunxun Technology Co., Ltd. served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025; Dongyang Shengfeng Clothing Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Fuzhou Reliable E-Commerce Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; GREENFOREST Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Gansu Fanxi Trading Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou BHL Fashion Co.,ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Chuangyimei Industry And Trade Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Guoxin Hardware Products Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Mingshen Jewelry Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Minissimi Leather Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou New Nice Jewelry Co.ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Oudina Clothing Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Phoenix Clothing Limited Company served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Senyisen Leather Goods Firm served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Shanhe Clothing Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Sunny(day) Leather Goods Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Xiangcheng Leather Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Yapai Leather Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Yazhi Jewelry Manufacturer served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Guangzhou Yutong Leather Goods Co. Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Haifeng Meilong Town Shengbairui Jewelry Factory served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Hangzhou Tongsheng Fashion Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Hangzhou Yeyinglong E-Commerce Co. Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Hebei The Best Information Technology Consulting Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Hefei Angels Trade Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Henan Jiheng Technology Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Hengshui Jiankang Trading Co., Ltd. served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025; Huixian Qiange Clothing Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Huizhou Qian Qian Industrial Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Huzhou Jindou Network Technology Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Jiangyin DH Garments Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Jiaxing Hongming Trading Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Jin Xidun (Xiamen) International Trade Co. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Ltd, Jinjiang Gongxia Trading Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Mogra Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Okal Light Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Peeqi Boutique (Dongguan) Co,ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Qingdao Yachuangmeirui Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Qingdao Yujunbao Household Products Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Quzhou Cindy Import And Export Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; SDFBK Official Stor served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shenzhen Baoan District Xinmeili Jewelry Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shenzhen Best Leather Handbags Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shenzhen Kebixiong Clothing Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shenzhen Wade Culture Communication Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1102571060 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1102751879 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1102753315 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1102771569 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1102985036 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1103356002 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1103477230 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1103807226 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop1103949229 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Shop912730081 Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; TRAFZA First Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Taizhou Luqiao Fengdao Trading Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; The Peach Bag Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Top Luxury Bags Vip Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; UNIZERA WM Store Store served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Wuhan Mantian Xingchen Trading Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Xiamen Boskims Garments Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Xiamen Deya Global Trade Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Xiamen Jiajiaming Leather Goods Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Xiamen Sky Pigeon Network Technology Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; YIWU QIANHENG JEWELRY CO.,LTD served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Hongmao Trading Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Jingzi Import & Export Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Liyi Commodity Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Ouze Clothing Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Qiudun Import & Export Co., Ltd. served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025; Yiwu Shanmei Arts And Gifts Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Shulong E-Commerce Firm served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Xinting Jewelry Co., Ltd served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Yiwu Yudian Clothes Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Zhangzhou Changtai Naimi Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; Zhuji Chengnan Import And Export Co., Ltd. served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. Document filed by Loewe, S.A...(Nastasi, Gabriela)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 10:20 AM
ORDER: On November 22, 2024, the Court issued a Temporary Restraining Order in this case (the " Order"). On November 25, 2024 the Court extended the Order at the Plaintiff's request until January 8, 2025 (the "Extension Order"). The Extension Order adjourned the hearing established in Section II.A of the Order to January 9, 2025 at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007 (the "Hearing"). Because the President has since declared January 9, 2025 a National Day of Mourning and the courthouse will be closed, the Hearing scheduled for January 9, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. will instead take place on January 10, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. Additionally, in light of the National Day of Mourning and courthouse closure, good cause exists to extend the Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2). The Order will remain in effect until January 9, 2025. Except as expressly modified by this Order, all other deadlines remain in full force and effect. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on Defendants. So ordered. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 5 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/3/2025) (js)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Memo Endorsement Thu 01/23 10:15 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON LETTER: re: Plaintiff respectfully requests modification of Section II of the TRO, specifically the briefing schedule, including the date of the Show Cause Hearing to allow Third Party Service Providers Alibaba and AliExpress additional time to comply with the expedited discovery ordered in the TRO, as well as an extension of the sealing period. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Plaintiff's request that the Court extend the Temporary Restraining Order issued on November 22, 2024 (the Order) is granted, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b) (2). The Order will remain in effect until January 8, 2025 pending the hearing and determination of Plaintiffs' Application for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs request that the hearing date be modified is granted. The hearing established in Section II.A of the Order is adjourned to January 9, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. The deadline for the submission of oppositions set forth in Section II.B of the Order is extended to January 3, 2025. The deadline for the submission of any reply papers set forth in Section II.B of the Order is extended to January 7, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. All other provisions of the Order remain in full force and effect Plaintiff's request to extend the sealing of this case is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint and exhibits attached thereto, and Plaintiffs ex parte Application and all declarations in support thereof and exhibits attached thereto, and this Order shall remain sealed until January 8, 2024. Any application to extend-the period during which those documents remain under seal must be submitted to the Court in writing no later than January 4, 2025. Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to serve this order on Defendants. So Ordered. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/25/2024) (js)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Temporary Restraining Order Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Based on the foregoing findings of fact and conclusions of law, Plaintiff's Application is hereby GRANTED as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, as sufficient cause has been shown, that Defendants are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions in the United States (with the exception of the acts and omissions described in paragraphs 8-9 below, which shall apply worldwide) pending the hearing and determination of Plaintiffs Application for a preliminary injunction as referenced in Paragraph II(A) below: as further set forth in this order. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to show cause before this Court in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York on December 4, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. or at such other time that this Court deems appropriate, why a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), should not issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that opposing papers, if any, shall be filed electronically with the Court and served on Plaintiffs counsel by delivering copies thereof to the office of Epstein Drangel LLP at 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 1250, New York, NY 10165, Attn: Jason M. Drangel on or before November 27, 2024. Plaintiff shall file any Reply papers on or before December, 2, 2024. VI. Security Bond IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall place security in the amount of ten thousand Dollars ($10,000) with the Court which amount is determined adequate for the payment of any damages any person may be entitled to recover as a result of an improper or wrongful restraint ordered hereunder. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint and exhibits attached thereto, and Plaintiff's ex parte Application and the Declarations of Nicolas Lambert and Gabriela N. Nastasi in support thereof and exhibits attached thereto, and this Order shall remain sealed until December 2, 2024. Any application to extend the period during which those documents remain under seal must be submitted to the Court in writing no later than November 27, 2024. So Ordered. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/22/2024) (js)
Related: [-]
19 19 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Wed 01/22 4:30 PM
DECLARATION OF GABRIELA N. NASTASI AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AN ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY:. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
18 18 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Wed 01/22 2:52 PM
DECLARATION OF NICOLAS LAMBERT AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AN ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITHTHE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
17 17 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Wed 01/22 12:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ATEMPORARY RESTRAININGORDER; ORDERRESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 01/22 12:40 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/22/2024) (js)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Proposed Order Wed 01/22 12:33 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion File Excess Pages Wed 01/22 12:29 PM
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/22 12:25 PM
PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
12 12 misc AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 01/22 12:15 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 01/22 12:04 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/22 12:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton for Loewe, S.A. Document filed by Loewe, S.A. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 11:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
8 8 40 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT:.***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 *** (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 34807).(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/22 10:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 6 ***..(js)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/22 9:18 AM
ORDER: The Court orders that this Action be unsealed, and Records Management upload all documents filed to date on the Electronic Case Filing system. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/10/2025) (js)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/10/2025. (Court Reporter Present) (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
Related: [-]
1 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/20/2024) (jus)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jus)
Related: [-]