Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 1:25-cv-20344
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Re-opened:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 6:07 AM EST
Defendant
KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC
Represented By
Kristian Manuel Gonzalez
contact info
Rachel Feder Daily
Kw Property Management & Consulting LLC
contact info
Matthew Harris Luttinger
Odevo
contact info
Frank Christopher Simone
Frank Simone, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Liusmila Silva
Represented By
Kristian Manuel Gonzalez
contact info
Rachel Feder Daily
Kw Property Management & Consulting LLC
contact info
Matthew Harris Luttinger
Odevo
contact info
Frank Christopher Simone
Frank Simone, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anyeline Labrada
Represented By
Ilona Demenina Anderson
Carpe Diem Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/17 3:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING29 MOTION TO WITHDRAW as Attorney. Ilona Demenina Anderson representing Labrada, Anyeline (Plaintiff) and Labrada, Anyeline (Counter Defendant) withdrawn from case. Responses due by 5/19/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/17 9:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ilona D. Anderson for / by Anyeline Labrada. Responses due by 5/1/2025. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 04/17 6:55 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Reopen Case. Response to Counterclaim due 4/18/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Reopen Case Wed 04/16 4:02 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case and Notice of Counter-Complaint by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC. (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
26 26 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 04/16 9:39 AM
ORDER on25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; Dismissing Action (With Prejudice) ; Closing Case. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/17 7:05 AM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Anyeline Labrada response/answer due 4/18/2025. (ls)(per DE #28)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 04/15 10:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Anyeline Labrada (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
24 24 respoth Claim Mon 04/07 11:39 PM
CLAIM Statement of Claim by Anyeline Labrada. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/07 5:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART22 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time Sat 04/05 12:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND COUNTERCLAIM re21 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, VI, VII and VIII) MOTION to Strike1 Complaint (Counts III and IV) ,19 Counterclaim by Anyeline Labrada. Responses due by 4/21/2025. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Strike Fri 03/21 1:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, VI, VII and VIII) , MOTION to Strike1 Complaint (Counts III and IV) by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC, Liusmila Silva. Responses due by 4/4/2025. (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Strike Fri 03/21 9:32 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying17 Motion to Strike ; denying18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (dsf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 cmp Counterclaim Thu 03/20 4:33 PM
Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Anyeline Labrada, filed by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC.(Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Demand Letter
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/20 3:56 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Liusmila Silva. Responses due by 4/3/2025. (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Strike Thu 03/20 3:51 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND PARTIAL , MOTION to Strike ( Responses due by 4/3/2025.) by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC. (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/03 11:21 AM
ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/26 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristian Manuel Gonzalez on behalf of KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC, Liusmila Silva. Attorney Kristian Manuel Gonzalez added to party KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristian Manuel Gonzalez added to party Liusmila Silva(pty:dft). (Gonzalez, Kristian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
14 14 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 02/25 2:46 PM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 02/21 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC: Response/Answer due 3/20/2025; Liusmila Silva: Response/Answer due 3/20/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/19 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Harris Luttinger on behalf of KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC, Liusmila Silva. Attorney Matthew Harris Luttinger added to party KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Harris Luttinger added to party Liusmila Silva(pty:dft). (Luttinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/19 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance and Notice of Email Designation by Rachel Feder Daily on behalf of KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC, Liusmila Silva. Attorney Rachel Feder Daily added to party KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Feder Daily added to party Liusmila Silva(pty:dft). (Daily, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/18 5:30 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Odevo US, Inc., Other Affiliate The Water Restoration Group, LLC, Other Affiliate HomeOwners Advantage, LLC, Other Affiliate Sharpe Project Developments, Inc. for KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 02/18 5:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC, Liusmila Silva. Attorney Frank Christopher Simone added to party KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Christopher Simone added to party Liusmila Silva(pty:dft). (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 01/27 5:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Anyeline Labrada. Liusmila Silva served on 1/27/2025, response/answer due 2/18/2025. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 01/27 5:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Anyeline Labrada. KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC served on 1/27/2025, response/answer due 2/18/2025. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Liusmila Silva. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Thu 01/23 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Anyeline Labrada re1 Complaint filed by Anyeline Labrada (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Thu 01/23 10:35 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. The party on the summons does not match the initiating documents. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/23 10:24 AM
Summons Issued as to KW Property Management & Consulting, LLC. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/23 10:13 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 8:48 PM
COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18143252, filed by Anyeline Labrada.(Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)