New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:25-cv-00676
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 6:33 AM EST
Defendant
DMG INVESTMENTS, LLC
Defendant
MC GOWAN BUILDERS, INC.
Defendant
HUIJIE LYU
Defendant
ONE PARK CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Defendant
P.C. RICHARD & SON
Defendant
REUTHER + BOWEN
Defendant
KATES NUSSMAN ELLIS FARHI AND EARLE
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-100
Defendant
HUESTON MCNULTY, PC
Defendant
YUANLUI HE
Defendant
DMG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Defendant
D&B SERVICE GROUP
Defendant
COLLADO ENGINEERING
Defendant
RICHARDS & SON BUILDER'S DIVISION
Represented By
DEREK MICHAEL ZISSER
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHISEA, SHAHINIAN AND GIANTOMASI
Defendant
ZEYU WANG, P.C.
Defendant
ARCHITECTURAL WINDOW MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Defendant
ARCHITECTURA, INC.
Defendant
WEI ZHU
Defendant
DMG PARK LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA LEYVA
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ONE PARK CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
Plaintiff
OLGA KRAVETS
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DOUG REUTHER
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
IRINA KLYATIS
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAEJIN CHOI
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PIOTR TORBAN
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
YELIN BAE
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GERALD ADAMS
Represented By
JEFFREY NASH TODD
The Todd Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
63 63 misc Application/Petition Fri 05/09 3:32 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel Crowder for by GERALD ADAMS.(TODD, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
62 62 misc Application/Petition Fri 05/09 3:27 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Dwight Anthony Robinson for by GERALD ADAMS.(TODD, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 08, 2025
61 61 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/08 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Judge Evelyn Padin, Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/8/25. (ak, )
Related: [-]
60 60 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 3:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARCHITECTURAL WINDOW MANUFACTURING COMPANY. ARCHITECTURAL WINDOW MANUFACTURING COMPANY waiver sent on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (LEAVY, MARK)
Related: [-]
59 59 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK JASON LEAVY on behalf of ARCHITECTURAL WINDOW MANUFACTURING COMPANY (LEAVY, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
58 58 misc Letter Wed 05/07 11:04 AM
Letter from Meredith Kaplan Stoma. (STOMA, MEREDITH)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 05/07 10:48 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document56 submitted by HUESTON MCNULTY, PC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/22/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 05/07 10:50 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document55 submitted by D&B SERVICE GROUP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/21/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
57 57 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 05/06 2:09 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to P,C RICHARD & SON, LLC I/S/H/A P.C. RICHARDS & SON BULDER'S DIVISION. Attorney DEREK MICHAEL ZISSER for RICHARDS & SON BUILDER'S DIVISION added. (ZISSER, DEREK)
Related: [-]
56 56 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 05/06 11:47 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Hueston McNulty, P.C.. Attorney ROBERT ALAN BERNS for HUESTON MCNULTY, PC added. (BERNS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 05/06 11:16 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint.. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANN HARRIS on behalf of D&B SERVICE GROUP (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Letter Tue 05/06 9:23 AM
Letter.(INGERSON-MAHAR, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 05/06 11:01 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document52 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COLLADO ENGINEERING has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been reset for 5/29/2025. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 05/06 4:41 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by P.C. RICHARD & SON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/27/2025. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
52 52 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 05/05 11:41 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Collado Engineering, DPC. Attorney MEREDITH KAPLAN STOMA for COLLADO ENGINEERING added. (STOMA, MEREDITH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
51 51 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 05/04 10:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ALAN BERNS on behalf of HUESTON MCNULTY, PC (BERNS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/02 8:43 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The48 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by CHIESA, SHAHINIAN, AND GIANTOMASI on 4/29/2025 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/20/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]