South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Referred: Molly H Cherry
Case #: 2:25-cv-00387
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 07, 2025 5:23 AM EST
Defendant
Chipotle Services, LLC
Represented By
Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Kierra N Brown
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiara K. Clay
Represented By
Matthew Owen King
Wigger Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
23 23 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 03/28 3:33 PM
Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Chipotle Services, LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Fri 03/28 2:59 PM
REFERENCE ORDER 21 granting 17 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/28/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
21 21 order Confidentiality Order Fri 03/28 2:58 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/28/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 03/28 2:57 PM
REFERENCE ORDER 19 granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/28/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/28 2:56 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/18/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/18/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/17/2025, Discovery due by 9/17/2025, Motions due by 11/17/2025, Mediation Due by 10/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 3/28/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/28 2:53 PM
CONSENT ORAL MOTION to Amend/Correct10 Scheduling Order, by Kiara K. Clay. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 motion Confidentiality Order Thu 03/27 12:12 PM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Chipotle Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/10/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Brown, Kierra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (proposed) Confidentiality Order
16 16 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/27 11:26 AM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kiara K. Clay.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 03/27 11:26 AM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Kiara K. Clay.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/27 11:23 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Kiara K. Clay.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Thu 03/13 3:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hye Yoon "Meriel" Kim ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12323547) by Chipotle Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application and Affidavit for PHV Admission
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Thu 03/13 3:13 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Mollohan, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12323481) by Chipotle Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application and Affidavit for PHV Admission
Friday, February 21, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 1:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/14/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/28/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 3/28/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/18/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/19/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/18/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/18/2025, Discovery due by 8/18/2025, Motions due by 10/17/2025, Mediation Due by 9/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 2/21/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 02/20 2:26 PM
Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chipotle Services, LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/20 2:24 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Chipotle Services, LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kierra N Brown on behalf of Chipotle Services, LLC (Brown, Kierra)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr on behalf of Chipotle Services, LLC (Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Thu 02/06 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiara K. Clay. Chipotle Services, LLC served on 1/30/2025, answer due 2/20/2025.(King, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 2:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Chipotle Services, LLC. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 01/22 1:59 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kiara K. Clay. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Chipotle Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12215821.), filed by Kiara K. Clay. Service due by 4/21/2025. (agaz, )
Related: [-]