Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00113
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 5:45 AM EST
Defendant
Capital One Financial Corporation
100 Shockoe Slip Fl 2
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Connor James Kelley
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Wikibuy LLC
Represented By
Connor James Kelley
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Wikibuy Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Connor James Kelley
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Ely
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, 11400 Bluegrass Pkwy
Louisville, KY 40299
Represented By
Steven Jeffrey Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Polina Brandler
Hammondlaw PC
contact info
Ari Cherniak
Hammondlaw, P.C.
contact info
Karina Grace Puttieva
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Pllc (dc-Na)
contact info
Julian Hammond
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
Douglas James McNamara
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Pllc (dc-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Edgar Oganesyan
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, 20254 Liverpool Way
Porter Ranch, CA 91326
Represented By
Steven Jeffrey Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Polina Brandler
Hammondlaw PC
contact info
Ari Cherniak
Hammondlaw, P.C.
contact info
Karina Grace Puttieva
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Pllc (dc-Na)
contact info
Julian Hammond
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
Douglas James McNamara
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Pllc (dc-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/26 3:50 PM
ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, [Doc. No. 110], be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that the April 23, 2025 hearing on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Counsel shall respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint by April 16, 2025; and it is further ORDERED that if Defendants' Counsel responds by way of motion to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall file an opposition by April 30, 2025; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Counsel shall file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, by May 7, 2025, if appropriate; and it is further ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on the Defendants' response, if done by way of a motion, on May 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 900, with the hearing held in open court, whereby all counsel may attend, however only Defendants' Counsel, and one of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel is required to attend. No other counsel is expected or is required to attend, and a transcript of the hearing will be made available. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/26/2025. (dzir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
misc Docket Annotation Thu 01/30 10:46 AM
ALL FUTURE DOCKET ENTRIES WILL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE, 1:25cv23. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 3:43 PM
ORDERED that this action be, and the same hereby is, CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under Civil Action Number 1:25-cv-00023 under the title In re Capital One Financial Corporation, Affiliate Marketing Litigation and assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge William B. Porter; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants deadlines to respond to this action are STAYED in light of the consolidation and forthcoming Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/29/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (other) Wed 01/29 11:35 AM
NOTICE by Capital One Financial Corporation, Wikibuy Holdings, LLC, Wikibuy LLC (Notice of Related Case)(Kelley, Connor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 11:22 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Financial Corporation, Wikibuy Holdings, LLC, Wikibuy LLC. (Kelley, Connor)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connor James Kelley on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation, Wikibuy Holdings, LLC, Wikibuy LLC (Kelley, Connor)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/29 10:09 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ari Cherniak for Matthew Ely,Ari Cherniak for Edgar Oganesyan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/29/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/29 10:08 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Polina Brandler for Matthew Ely,Polina Brandler for Edgar Oganesyan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/29/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/29 10:07 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Julian Hammond for Matthew Ely,Julian Hammond for Edgar Oganesyan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/29/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/29 4:57 PM
Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala no longer assigned to the case. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 3:33 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ari Cherniak and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9973590. by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 3:14 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Polina Brandler and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9973443. by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 2:42 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian Ari Hammond and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9973301. by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 01/27 9:03 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Douglas James McNamara for Matthew Ely,Douglas James McNamara for Edgar Oganesyan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/27/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 01/27 9:02 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Karina Grace Puttieva for Matthew Ely,Karina Grace Puttieva for Edgar Oganesyan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/27/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/24 9:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edgar Oganesyan, Matthew Ely. All Defendants. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Fri 01/24 3:10 PM
Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to file documents in PDF format in the future. Multiple documents were filed in fillable form and corrected, No action needed. re3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice,4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice,1 Complaint. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 4:55 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas James McNamara and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9965830. by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 4:44 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karina G. Puttieva and Certification of Local Counsel Steven J. Toll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9965739. by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan. (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/23 11:51 AM
Proposed Summons by Matthew Ely, Edgar Oganesyan (Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 8:42 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9961568.), filed by Edgar Oganesyan, Matthew Ely.(Toll, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 01/24 3:03 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]