California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00165
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 1:08 AM PST
Defendant
Christopher Compton
Defendant
Donna Compton
Plaintiff
Gary Steven Hann
PO Box 711
Cathedral City, CA 92235


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 05/05 4:23 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff shall serve defendants no later than June 2, 2025, and shall file proofs of service no later than June 5, 2025. The Court's Order of March 14, 2025, is superceded and plaintiff's Application for e-filing privileges8 is hereby granted. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
20 20 misc Response Thu 04/17 11:24 AM
ANSWER TO THE COURT' S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE13 filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 2:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint10 as to Defendants Christopher Compton, Donna Compton. (lom)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Summons Request Tue 04/15 2:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint10 filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 notice Deficiency in Summons Mon 04/14 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request16 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the "To:"section of the summons. See section: To: (Defendant's name and address). Compton & Compton PLLC is not a defendant in this case. If Compton & Compton is part of the address, please use c/o. Defendants must be named as on the First Amended Complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Summons Request Mon 04/14 10:48 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on First Amended Complaint10 filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 04/10 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request14 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the First Amended complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the First Amended complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Summons Request Thu 04/10 4:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint10 filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (iv)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/10 1:05 PM
(In Chambers) Order to Show Cause by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/17/2025. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 04/09 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request11 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the First Amended complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the First Amended complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 notice Summons Request Wed 04/09 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint10 filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
10 10 othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/26 11:16 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Wed 03/26 8:48 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Denying8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Fri 03/14 6:01 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/04 10:00 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 01/27 1:59 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:25-cv-00165 FMO(SHKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 01/22 1:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/22 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 1:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendants Christopher Compton, Donna Compton. (car)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/22 1:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 01/22 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Christopher Compton, Donna Compton. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 405 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Gary Steven Hann. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet