California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Referred: Chi Soo Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-00264
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 6:09 PM PST
Defendant
Brandon Compton
Defendant
County of Plumas
Plaintiff
N.P. Doe
Represented By
Calvin Chang
Cal Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/11 10:28 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to County of Plumas on 3/27/2025, Answer due 5/27/2025 (Kloeppel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 order Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/31 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/31/2025: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (ECF No.2 .) Absent opposition by Defendants, and good cause having been shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff shall be referred to as "N.P. Doe" and all other potential plaintiffs or victims shall be referred to by their initials. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Deputy Clerk GJM)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Mon 03/31 2:12 PM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
12 12 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/31 2:12 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/31/2025 RELATING Cases 2:24-cv-2640 and 2:25-cv-0264. Case 2:25-cv-0264 is REASSIGNED to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:25-cv-0264 DJC CSK. (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 03/28 7:11 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/28 6:58 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Brandon Compton (Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 7 pgs misc Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (Civil) for TLN Mon 03/24 9:39 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Mon 03/24 9:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandon Compton, County of Plumas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Calvin Chang* *Cal Law APC* *500 Capitol Mall Suite 2350* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Mon 03/24 9:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. The new case number is: 2:25-cv-0264 TLN SCR. (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Related Case Sat 03/22 6:59 AM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:24-cv-02640-DJC by N.P. Doe. (Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/05 2:31 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by N.P. Doe.(Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 01/22 3:53 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 2/24/2025. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/22 1:26 PM
MOTION to PROCEED UNDER a PSEUDONYM by N.P. Doe.(Chang, Calvin).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Calvin Chang,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 20, 2025
1 1 22 pgs PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by N.P. Doe. (Attachments #1 : Civil Cover Sheet) (Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11987155. (Chang, Calvin)
Related: [-]