Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00048
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 1:21 AM CST
Defendant
Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel (1)
Represented By
Ricardo Xavier Guerra
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Christine Alyson Cortez
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 2:10 AM CST
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 12/10/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (dlg5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on December 9, 2024 at 03:35 PM as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel held on 12/10/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Termination of applicable hearings to follow accordingly. Appearances: Tae Chon AUSA; FPD David Castillo (on duty); USPO: Brenda Garza ; USM: Deputy Jeff Shepard. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:47 AM - 9:55 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana/Suzanne Buckley, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. Agent: Adrian Davila (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. (dmg5). [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. Detention Hearing set for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. (dmg5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. (dmg5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ricardo Xavier Guerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel, filed. (Guerra, Ricardo) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
13 13 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (am5) [5:24-mj-01908]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Roberto Urquiza-Rangel (1) count(s) 1, filed. (egg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment