Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen P Mcglynn
Case #: 3:25-cv-00096
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 04/14 1:02 PM
ORDER: For good cause shown,14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File brief is GRANTED . Plaintiff shall file her brief no later than June 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/14/2025. (trf)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/14 12:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief (Unopposed) by Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 order Order Setting SS Briefing Schedule Tue 03/25 10:44 AM
ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant's brief due within 30 days after filing of plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/25/2025. (aca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Levitt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 soc-sec Social Security Transcript of Administrative Record Mon 03/24 12:00 PM
SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record. filed by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Wyatt, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 6 Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Medical Records
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
10 10 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 3:23 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/29 11:45 AM
ORDER:2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED . Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 1/29/2025. (trf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Tue 01/28 10:45 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 386, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 25-cv-96-SPM. (aca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 3:52 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Requesting Consent Fri 01/24 8:36 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 386, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier on 1/24/2025. Consent due by 2/14/2025 (aca)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Opening Notification Fri 01/24 8:35 AM
Notice of Commencement of Action and Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. An electronic copy of the Complaint is attached. All future documents must bear case number 25-cv-96-RJD. This notice suffices for service under Supplemental Rule 3 as it provides a means of electronic access to the complaint to the SSAOGC and the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Illinois. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (aca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/23 10:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Valorie Ann Childers-Bleier.(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet