Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00222

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:25-ap-00013
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southeast Auto Group
Represented By
Southeast Auto Group
contact info
Defendant
Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc.
Represented By
Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Lee Geller
Represented By
Lee Geller
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Mandell Geller
Represented By
Wendy Mandell Geller
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
George F. Sanderson, III
The Sanderson Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 04/23 1:37 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar FPTC & Trial (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/23 1:36 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 5/16/2025. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 6/20/2025 for Plaintiff, 7/11/2025 for Defendant, 7/25/2025 for Plaintiff rebuttal. Discovery due: 9/12/2025. Amendment(s) due by 5/30/1935. Motions due by 9/19/2025. Motion to Withdraw Reference due by 5/16/2025. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/24/2025 at 10:15 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Warren. Pretrial Order due by 9/22/2025. Trial date set for 10/2/2025 at 02:00 PM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor). . (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 admis Pre-Conference Report Tue 04/22 4:46 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Algernon L. Butler III, George F. Sanderson III on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee, Lee Geller, Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc., Wendy Mandell Geller, Southeast Auto Group Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 8 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Tue 03/25 10:02 AM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 4/24/2025. . (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Schedule Tue 03/25 10:00 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 5:45 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Algernon L. Butler III on behalf of Lee Geller, Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc., Wendy Mandell Geller, Southeast Auto Group. (Butler, Algernon)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 02/03 3:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 3/24/2025. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, January 31, 2025
5 5 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Fri 01/31 4:32 PM
First Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Algernon L. Butler III on behalf of Lee Geller, Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc., Wendy Mandell Geller, Southeast Auto Group Related [+]. (Butler, Algernon)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Algernon L. Butler III on behalf of Lee Geller, Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc., Wendy Mandell Geller, Southeast Auto Group. (Butler, Algernon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/28 4:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lee Geller 1/23/2025; Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc. 1/23/2025; Wendy Mandell Geller 1/23/2025; Southeast Auto Group 1/23/2025. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 01/22 3:10 PM
Summons Issued on Southeast Auto Group Answer Due 02/21/2025; Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc. Answer Due 02/21/2025; Lee Geller Answer Due 02/21/2025; Wendy Mandell Geller Answer Due 02/21/2025 (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 3:10 PM
Adversary case 25-00013 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Southeast Auto Group, Get Rid of Your Car.Com Inc., Lee Geller, Wendy Mandell Geller (Fee Paid) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]