Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 1:25-bk-50713
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Caymus Funding Inc.
3550 George Busbee Pkwy NW Ste 225
Kennesaw, GA 30144-5430
Represented By
Scott B. Riddle
Law Office Of Scott B. Riddle, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 01/22/2025 7:00 PM EST
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 47 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/23 1:09 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Scott B. Riddle of Law Office of Scott B. Riddle, LLC on behalf of Caymus Funding Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/23/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 05/23/2025. (Riddle, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of United States Trustee. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Thu 01/23 3:12 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 2/24/2025 at 02:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Thu 01/23 3:14 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 1/23/2025. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Thu 01/23 3:17 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Corporate Resolution due 2/6/2025. (cws)
Related: [-]