California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Case #: 3:25-cv-00146
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:2241fd Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum Tue 01/28 11:33 AM
ORDER Denying Petition As Moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant on 01/28/2025. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/24 6:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum filed by Steven C. Stafford. (McCollough, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/23 1:51 PM
ORDER Requiring Response. Responses due by 1/24/2025, at 11:59 P.M.. Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant on 01/23/2025.(mjw)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. McCollough on behalf of Steven C. Stafford (McCollough, Jennifer) (ggv)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Withdrawal of Document Thu 01/23 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Steven C. Stafford re3 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven C. Stafford . (McCollough, Jennifer) (ggv)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 10:30 AM
** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF NO.4 ** NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. McCollough on behalf of Steven C. Stafford (McCollough, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer E. McCollough added to party Steven C. Stafford(pty:res) (ggv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum Thu 01/23 9:23 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by Sergio Falcon Pedroza.(axi) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 01/23 9:22 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Pam Bondi, Ronald L. Davis, GEO Group Facility Administrator - San Diego, Benjamine Huffman, MCC Warden - San Diego, Steven C. Stafford, No Fee Required, filed by Sergio Falcon Pedroza. The new case number is 3:25-cv-146-BAS. Judge Cynthia Bashant is assigned to the case. (Muro, Cindy)(axi) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus