Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-10461

Louisiana Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael A Crawford
Case #: 3:25-ap-01004
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendants
Bank of St. Francisville
5700 Commerce Street
St. Francisville, LA 70775
Represented By
Bank of St. Francisville
contact info
Defendants
Citizens Bank & Trust Company
57910 Main Street
Plaquemine, LA 70764
Represented By
Citizens Bank & Trust Company
contact info
Plaintiffs
Beeland Properties, LLC
10875 Brown Road
Denham Springs, LA 70726
Represented By
Ryan James Richmond
Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
32 32 order Extend Time Thu 05/22 3:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings Related [+] Filed on 5/22/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 30
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/22 2:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)30 Motion to Extend Time filed by Cross Defendant Bank of St. Francisville, Defendants Bank of St. Francisville) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extend Time Thu 05/22 2:11 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 10, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 05/10 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)25 Order on Motion to Extend Time. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/09 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville RE: related document(s)27 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Cross Defendant Bank of St. Francisville, Defendants Bank of St. Francisville. (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 05/09 3:14 PM
Answer to Crossclaim of Citizen Bank & Trust Company Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/08 10:32 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)25 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Extend Time Thu 05/08 9:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings Related [+] Filed on 5/8/2025. Bank of St. Francisville Answer due: 5/22/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 4:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)23 Motion to Extend Time filed by Cross Defendant Bank of St. Francisville, Defendants Bank of St. Francisville) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend Time Tue 05/06 4:13 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Wed 04/30 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)20 Order on Motion to Extend Time. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 1:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)20 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
20 20 order Extend Time Mon 04/28 4:24 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Cross Claim Related [+] Filed on 4/28/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 18
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/28 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)18 Motion to Extend Time filed by Cross Defendant Bank of St. Francisville, Defendants Bank of St. Francisville) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extend Time Mon 04/28 11:47 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Cross Claim Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 03/23 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)15 Order on Motion to Extend Time. Notice Date 03/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 4:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)15 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Extend Time Fri 03/21 4:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings toCross Claim Related [+] Filed on 3/21/2025. (jpoc)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)13 Motion to Extend Time filed by Cross Defendant Bank of St. Francisville, Defendants Bank of St. Francisville) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extend Time Fri 03/21 2:19 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Cross Claim Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/13 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by David S. Rubin RE: related document(s)10 Answer to Complaint filed by Cross-Claimant Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Defendants Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Crossclaim) (Rubin, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Notice of Deficiency for Certificate of Service - form Thu 03/13 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Failure to comply with Local Rule 9013-4 regarding Certificate of Service. **CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MUST BE FILED SEPARATELY AND MUST IDENTIFY PARTIES SERVED, ADDRESS AND METHOD OF SERVICE** Please refer to Local Rule 9013-4 and correct the error. Failure to correct this error within 7 days may result in the court's striking the document without further notice from the court. RE: related document(s)10 Answer to Complaint filed by Cross-Claimant Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Defendants Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Crossclaim. Document(s) due by 3/20/2025. Filed by (scha)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Crossclaim Thu 03/13 11:51 AM
Answer to Complaint and , Crossclaim Against Bank of St. Francisville by Citizens Bank & Trust Company against Bank of St. Francisville Filed by David S. Rubin on behalf of Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Rubin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 02/28 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)7 Order on Motion to Extend Time. Notice Date 02/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 10:22 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)7 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Extend Time Wed 02/26 9:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to Bank of St. Francisville Related [+] Filed on 2/26/2025. Responsive Pleadings due: 4/22/2025. (scha)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 2:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP RE: related document(s)5 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendants Bank of St. Francisville) (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extend Time Tue 02/25 2:37 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings Filed by Tristan Manthey of Fishman Haygood, LLP on behalf of Bank of St. Francisville (Manthey, Tristan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 02/20 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)3 Scheduling Order. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/18 3:44 PM
Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference Filed on 2/18/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at 707 Florida St., Rm. 222. (scha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/22 5:04 PM
Summons Issued on Bank of St. Francisville Date Issued 1/22/2025, Answer Due 2/21/2025; Citizens Bank & Trust Company Date Issued 1/22/2025, Answer Due 2/21/2025 and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Filed on 1/22/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 03:30 PM at 707 Florida St., Rm. 222. (scha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/22 3:19 PM
Adversary case 25-01004 Complaint to Avoid and Rank Mortgages by Beeland Properties, LLC against Bank of St. Francisville, Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Fee Amount $350. 13 Related [+]1421 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)91 (Declaratory judgment)(Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Chart
Att: 2 Exhibit B - LP Mortgage 1
Att: 3 Exhibit C - LP Mortgage 3
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Sterlington Mortgage
Att: 5 Exhibit E - EBRP Mortgage 1
Att: 6 Exhibit F - EBRP Mortgage 2
Att: 7 Exhibit G - LP Mortgage 2
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Act of Credit Sale
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Check
Att: 10 Exhibit - Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet