Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:25-bk-40248
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Pivotal Med Supply, LLC, Debtor in Possession
2010 E Continental Blvd Ste F
Southlake, TX 76092-9734
Represented By
Richard G. Grant
Culhane Meadows, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
110 110 order Extend/Shorten time Wed 05/14 2:52 PM
Agreed Order Extending Next Science, LLC's and Debtor, Pivotal Med Supply, LLC's Deadlines to Respond to the Debtor's Objection to Next Science, LLC's Proof of Claim and to Next Science, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Counterclaims in Adversary 25-04036 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(56613075,'Pivotal_Med_Supply,_LLC',109);">109 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Entered on 5/14/2025. (Spelmon, Teshauna)
Related: [-] related document(s)109 Motion to extend time to Response to Debtor's Claim Objection (RE: related document(s)103 Motion to disallow claims)
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
109 109 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 05/13 11:56 AM
Motion to extend time to Response to Debtor's Claim Objection Related [+] Filed by Creditor Next Science LLC, Debtor Pivotal Med Supply, LLC Objections due by 6/3/2025. (Simon, Robert)
Related: [-] 103 Motion to disallow claims
Att: 1 Proposed Order