California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 3:25-cv-00805
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 1:49 AM PST
Defendant
Ashton M. Braun
Defendant
Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC
Defendant
Matthew Clark, CA
Defendant
Silo Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
30 30 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 05/06 7:23 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sohal, Vikram)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 05/06 5:24 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nasnas, Nadine)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 05/06 2:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
27 27 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Mon 05/05 10:00 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 9:30 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark identifying Corporate Parent Sierra Nevada Produce, LLC, Other Affiliate Los Angeles Produce Fresh, LLC for Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC. (Nasnas, Nadine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/24 5:11 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re:25 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/23 3:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark (Nasnas, Nadine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/22 6:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark. (Nasnas, Nadine)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 04/21 10:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - CONVERTING THE MAY 23, 2025 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 04/21 10:32 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2025. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/21/2025. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
21 21 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/17 10:40 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 04/17 9:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 7:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Silo Technologies, Inc., Ashton M. Braun.. (Sohal, Vikram)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Ashton M. Braun, Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark, Silo Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20268845.). Filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable.(Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Statements and Invoices,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet