New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:25-cv-00693
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
RTW RETAILWINDS ACQUISITION LLC
Plaintiff
HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info
MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info
MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info
MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Wilson Elser
contact info
MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 misc Certification Fri 04/04 11:43 AM
Certification of Melissa C. Terranova, Esq. on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re19 Clerk's Judgment. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/04 10:38 AM
CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY against RTW RETAILWINDS ACQUISITION LLC in the amount of $299,927.94. Signed by Ashley Vargas, Deputy Clerk on 4/4/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 04/04 10:28 AM
Exhibit to14 Request for Default Judgment by Clerk Attorney Declaration by All Plaintiffs. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Fri 04/04 10:21 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The14 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment submitted by Melissa Terranova on 3/27/2025 cannot be granted due to missing documents. PLEASE SUBMIT an AFFIDAVIT USING EVENT *Exhibit to Document* and linking it to the14 Clerk's Entry. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 04/03 6:51 PM
Exhibit to14 Request for Default Judgment by Clerk Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs.(TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 2:20 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the withdrawal of the12 Motion for Default Judgment and13 Certification. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 3/31/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Mon 03/31 3:14 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The14 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment submitted by Melissa Terranova on 3/27/2025 cannot be granted due to missing documents. PLEASE SUBMIT an Affidavit and a Proposed order USING EVENT *Exhibit to Document* and linking it to the14 Clerk's Entry. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Thu 03/27 6:01 PM
Letter from Melissa C. Terranova, Esq. re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant RTW Retailwinds Acquisition, LLC ,13 Certification. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for Default Judgment by Clerk Thu 03/27 5:19 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by All Plaintiffs against Defendant.(TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
13 13 misc Certification Thu 03/27 5:16 PM
Certification on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re12 Motion for Default Judgment. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/27 2:47 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant RTW Retailwinds Acquisition, LLC by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/21/2025.(TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/27 4:23 PM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant RTW Retailwinds Acquisition, LLC . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Judge Robert Kirsch. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 03/14 9:22 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RTW RETAILWINDS ACQUISITION LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 03/12 11:34 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY against Defendant.(TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Attorney Declaration in Support of Request,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/04 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY(TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Certificate of Registration
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Fri 01/31 12:01 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Hartford Fire Insurance Company was entered incorrectly on the docket as Hartford Fire Insurance Comapny. The party has been updated and the summons at docket entry2 has been updated to reflect the correct spelling. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) Tue 01/28 5:56 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMAPNY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD. Amendment to6 Exhibit (to Document) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET . (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Refund Fees Mon 01/27 2:30 PM
Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Melissa Connolly, Management Analyst on 01/27/2025. (mls)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 8:57 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added MELISSA CATHERINE TERRANOVA as representing HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMAPNY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD and TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 01/24 10:08 PM
Exhibit to3 Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 01/24 9:42 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMAPNY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD. (TERRANOVA, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Refund of Fees Fri 01/24 11:52 AM
Application for Refund of Fees from Maxwell L. Billek (finance notified).. (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/24 10:22 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against RTW RETAILWINDS ACQUISITION LLC, filed by PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMAPNY, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST.(BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 9:40 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RTW RETAILWINDS ACQUISITION LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 01/24 9:27 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/24 9:27 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Fri 01/24 9:28 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 01/24 9:37 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15962737) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMAPNY, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST.(BILLEK, MAXWELL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/24 9:35 AM
Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]