California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-00805
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 1:51 AM PST
Defendant
Ashton M. Braun
Defendant
Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC
Defendant
Matthew Clark, CA
Defendant
Silo Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.
Represented By
Craig Alan Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 7:01 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Silo Technologies, Inc., Ashton M. Braun. (Sohal, Vikram)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/06 7:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.. Service waived by Matthew Clark waiver sent on 2/21/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/06 7:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.. Service waived by Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/25 12:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.. Service waived by Ashton M. Braun waiver sent on 2/4/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/25 12:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc.. Service waived by Silo Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 02/04 12:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc... (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/04 12:53 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 01/27 2:55 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, via Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Ashton M. Braun, Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark, Silo Technologies, Inc.. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Mon 01/27 10:01 AM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Fri 01/24 11:03 AM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/24 10:28 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,4 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,3 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,5 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/24 10:29 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Only ONE Summons will be issued to ALL defendants. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,4 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,3 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable,5 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/24 4:34 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Please only submit ONE summons form, with all defendants listed. Please use an attachment page to list defendants that do not fit. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please correct re-file in its entirety. Re:8 Proposed Summons filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 01/23 2:32 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/23 12:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/23 12:38 PM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/23 12:37 PM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/23 12:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/23 12:34 PM
Proposed Summons. (Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Ashton M. Braun, Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC, Matthew Clark, Silo Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20268845.). Filed by Coast Citrus Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Olympic Fruit & Vegetable.(Stokes, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Statements and Invoices,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet