Idaho District Court
Judge:Debora K Grasham
Case #: 4:25-cv-00038
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 3:43 AM MDT
Defendant
Bayer CropScience Corporation, LP
Plaintiff
Wade Yost
Represented By
Ryan S. Dustin
Casperson Ulrich Dustin PLLC
contact info
DeAnne Casperson
Casperson Ulrich Dustin PLLC
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Casperson Ulrich Dustin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Service Tue 05/13 9:01 AM
DOCKET ORDER GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint (Dkt. 10). For the reasons stated in the Motion, the Court finds good cause has been shown to extend time for Plaintiff to serve the Amended Complaint and Summons to on or before May 20, 2025 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham by (LT)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/12 12:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wade Yost (Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 motion Service Wed 04/30 3:43 PM
MOTION for Service DeAnne Casperson appearing for Plaintiff Wade Yost. Responses due by 5/21/2025(Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of DeAnne Casperson in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 2:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Bayer CropScience Corporation, LP, filed by Wade Yost.(Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Summons served on Bayer Cropscience Corp., LP-Amanda Charlton on April 14, 2025, filed by Wade Yost. (Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 order Order Mon 03/31 2:17 PM
DOCKET ORDER Resetting Dates. Upon the request of Plaintiff and to allow time for Defendant to be served and appear, the deadline for filing a joint litigation plan and a discovery plan (Dkt. 5) is HEREBY RESET to May 22, 2025 . The telephonic scheduling conference is HEREBY RESET to May 29, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. (MT) . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham by (LT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 misc Status Report Thu 02/20 4:42 PM
STATUS REPORT of Service by Wade Yost. (Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 order Litigation Order Tue 01/28 7:29 AM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2025 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. On or before March 27, 2025, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/24 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich on behalf of Wade Yost (Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/24 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Dustin on behalf of Wade Yost (Dustin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Bayer CropScience Corporation, LP ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2871797.), filed by Wade Yost.(Casperson, DeAnne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons