District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00082
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:2302 Merit System Principles
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
GINA GROSS
Defendant
JENNY MAUK
Defendant
JACOB SGAMBATI
Plaintiff
PRABHJOT BAJWA
43268 Novi Ter.
Ashburn, VA 20147

GPO Apr 16 2025
OPINION re: Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/16/2025. (lcdh)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/16 10:23 PM
ORDER: GRANTING Defendants'4 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's2 Motions to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/16/2025. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 04/16 10:22 PM
OPINION re: Defendants'4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/16/2025. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 respm Surreply Fri 04/04 4:01 PM
SURREPLY to re4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PRABHJOT BAJWA. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 04/01 11:34 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re4 Motion to Dismiss filed by GINA GROSS, JENNY MAUK, JACOB SGAMBATI. (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 motion Stay Wed 03/26 4:32 PM
MOTION to Stay re4 MOTION to Dismiss by PRABHJOT BAJWA. (See Docket Entry5 to view document) (zjm)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 03/26 4:31 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re4 Motion to Dismiss filed by PRABHJOT BAJWA. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss Sun 03/23 5:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by GINA GROSS, JENNY MAUK, JACOB SGAMBATI.(Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 03/23 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of All Defendants (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 motion Stay Thu 01/23 12:05 PM
MOTION to Stay by PRABHJOT BAJWA. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
service Summons Issued Thu 01/23 12:01 PM
SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to GINA GROSS. (zjm) Modified on 1/23/2025 (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/23 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against GINA GROSS, JENNY MAUK, JACOB SGAMBATI ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 208875) filed by PRABHJOT BAJWA.(zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 01/23 12:02 PM
SUMMONS (5) Issued as to GINA GROSS, JENNY MAUK, JACOB SGAMBATI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjm)
Related: [-]