Linfo IP, LLC v. AIRPLANTSHOP.COM, INC.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Monte C Richardson |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00078 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2025 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
AirPlantShop.com, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Linfo IP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Patent Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (BD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/27 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER dismissing case re 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/26/2025. (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Linfo IP, LLC (Brieant, Victoria) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() RETURN of service executed on 03/04/2025 by Linfo IP, LLC as to AirPlantShop.com, Inc.. (Brieant, Victoria) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 01/31 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 01/31 9:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/31/2025. (CKS) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Patent Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (LNR) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS issued as to AirPlantShop.com, Inc. (LNR) |
|
Sunday, January 26, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Victoria Elisabeth Brieant on behalf of Linfo IP, LLC. Lead Counsel: Victoria Elisabeth Brieant. (Brieant, Victoria) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 01/24 3:34 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Victoria Elisabeth Brieant of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 01/24 3:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:25-cv-78-WWB-MCR. (AJS) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AIRPLANTSHOP.COM, INC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22944420) filed by Linfo IP, LLC.(Brieant, Victoria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |