California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00015
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 11:26 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robert Lemke (1)
Terminated: 01/22/2025


Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 12:02 AM PST
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION: Received from The Southern District of New York as to Robert Lemke (1). (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]