North Dakota District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00011
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 1:15 AM CST
Defendant
Aly Cherif (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan J. O'Konek
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Jan 22 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting 4 Motion to Unseal Case as to Aly Cherif. (GW)

Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 2:02 AM CST
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
Case unsealed as to Aly Cherif (rh)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Aly Cherif (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 Redacted Indictment as to Aly Cherif. (jb)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Unseal Case Indictment and Warrant by USA as to Aly Cherif. (O'Konek, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting4 Motion to Unseal Case as to Aly Cherif. (GW)
Related: [-]