Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00028
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 1:35 AM CST
Defendant
Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (1)
Represented By
Case J. Darwin
Law Office Of Case J. Darwin, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anne Marie Cordova
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 2:29 AM CST
Monday, January 06, 2025
Arrest of Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino. (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino. (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino held on 1/7/2025. Defendant requests appointment of counsel (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Case J. Darwin for Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino appointed. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/10/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion to Continue as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (1) Entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ac1) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino. (Darwin, Case) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino, (Detention Hearing set for 1/15/2025 10:00 AM in San Antonio before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney, Preliminary Hearing set for 1/15/2025 10:00 AM in San Antonio before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bot1) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (Darwin, Case) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (r013) [5:25-mj-00020-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino (bot2)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Arraignment as to Juan Carlos Alvarez-Nino Arraignment set for 2/5/2025 3:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (r013)
Related: [-]