Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00027
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2025 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (1)
Represented By
Brigitte Garza
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anne Marie Cordova
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Feb 03 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
GPO Feb 04 2025
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 2:32 AM CST
Thursday, January 02, 2025
Arrest of Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (vs1) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia. (vs1) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia. (vs1) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Initial Appearance as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia held on 1/2/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (mgr) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (mgr) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Brigitte Garza for Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia appointed. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to Detained without Bond Pending Detention Hearing as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/7/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (Garza, Brigitte) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (r013) [5:25-mj-00001-RBF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia (bot2)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Arraignment as to Nelson Joel Mejia-Mejia Arraignment set for 2/5/2025 3:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (r013)
Related: [-]