U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Judge:Robin M Meriweather
Case #: 1:25-cv-00132
Nature of Suit138
Cause28:1491 Tucker Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 6:02 AM EDT
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Laura Offenbacher Aradi
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
IGNITE FUELING INNOVATION, INC.
Represented By
Nathaniel James Greeson
Bradley
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2025 1:55 PM EST
Thursday, January 23, 2025
1 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10156850) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by IGNITE FUELING INNOVATION, INC.. Answer due by 3/24/2025.(lb1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Exhibit A),
Att: 3 Exhibit (Exhibit B),
Att: 4 Exhibit (Exhibit C),
Att: 5 Exhibit (Exhibit D),
Att: 6 Exhibit (Exhibit E),
Att: 7 Exhibit (Exhibit F),
Att: 8 Exhibit (Exhibit G)
2 2 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint,, filed by IGNITE FUELING INNOVATION, INC.. Service: 1/23/2025. Response due by 2/6/2025. (lb1)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by IGNITE FUELING INNOVATION, INC.. Service: 1/23/2025. Response due by 2/6/2025. (lb1)
Related: [-]
4 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by IGNITE FUELING INNOVATION, INC.. Service: 1/23/2025.(lb1)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (lb1)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lb1)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Offenbacher Aradi for USA . (Aradi, Laura)
Related: [-]