South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 2:25-cv-00458
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Slim Rx, LLC
Plaintiff
Novo Nordisk A/S
Represented By
Samantha Lynn LeJune
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Thomas Richmond McPherson, III
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Angela Gilbert Strickland
Bowman And Brooke
contact info
Plaintiff
Novo Nordisk Inc
Represented By
Samantha Lynn LeJune
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Thomas Richmond McPherson, III
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Angela Gilbert Strickland
Bowman And Brooke
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/21 1:03 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/25/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/8/2025, Fact Discovery shall be completed no later than 09/19/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/3/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2025, Discovery due by 1/9/2026, Motions due by 2/20/2026, Jury Selection Deadline 5/18/2026, Mediation Due by 3/13/2026. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 04/21/2025. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 04/17 3:38 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.(McPherson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR 26.03 Answers and Proposed Discovery Plan
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/13 5:08 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Slim Rx, LLC.(Daniel, Charles)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Mediation Order Thu 03/13 8:57 AM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 9/8/2025. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/13/2025. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 03/13 8:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/3/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/17/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 4/17/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/8/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/9/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/9/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/9/2025, Discovery due by 9/8/2025, Motions due by 10/8/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 1/6/2026, Mediation Due by 9/8/2025. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/13/2025. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 5:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Slim Rx, LLC.(Daniel, Charles)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
6 6 4 pgs service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Sat 02/08 12:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. Slim Rx, LLC served on 1/30/2025, answer due 2/20/2025. (McPherson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 1 pgs misc Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Fri 01/24 11:14 AM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Slim Rx, LLC. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 4 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 01/24 9:48 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Slim Rx, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12222876.), filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. Service due by 4/23/2025(rhei, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Portion of Defendant's Website,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Example of Defendant's Promotional Posts