Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswel
Case #: 1:25-cv-00245
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 2:36 AM MDT
Petitioner
United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By
Vincent Justin Velardo
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Baraka Enterprises I, LLC


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/14 4:30 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 4/14/2025. Text Only Entry (tlove, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 04/14 2:38 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/14/2025. ORDERED that the clerk's office shall reassign this case by random draw. [This case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for all further proceedings. All further proceedings shall be designated as 25-cv-245-GPG] (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Mon 02/03 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Judge William J. Martinez. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-245-PAB (angar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
4 4 misc Reassigning Judge Fri 01/24 11:16 AM
REASSIGNING JUDGE. This case was originally assigned in error, therefore is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell,. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-245-WJM-MDB. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 01/24 11:12 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 01/24 11:08 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Petition/Application Fri 01/24 10:44 AM
PETITION to Appoint Umpire for Appraisal (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10110947)Attorney Vincent Justin Velardo added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:pet), filed by United States Liability Insurance Company.(Velardo, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - CVx