California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Referred: Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00312
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2025
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 1:43 AM PST
Defendant
Infinitely Expanding Networks Inc.
Plaintiff
Marshall Jenkins
Represented By
Dana J. Oliver
Oliver Law Center, Inc.
contact info
Anthony Paronich, PHV
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/07 11:10 AM
CASE DISMISSED in its entirety, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See ECF No.8 . CASE CLOSED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Deputy Clerk GJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/06 11:49 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Marshall Jenkins. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/08 1:01 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Infinitely Expanding Networks Inc. served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 10:55 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 1/24/2025 GRANTING5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Anthony Paronich, PHV for Marshall Jenkins. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 01/24 1:06 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Marshall Jenkins for attorney Anthony I. Paronich to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11998960) (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Fri 01/24 10:02 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk AS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Fri 01/24 10:01 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Infinitely Expanding Networks Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dana J. Oliver* *Oliver Law Center, Inc.* *8780 19th Street, #559* *Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91701*. (Deputy Clerk AS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Marshall Jenkins. (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT against Infinitely Expanding Networks Inc. by Marshall Jenkins. Attorney Oliver, Dana J. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11997130) (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]