Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Referred: Ryon M Mccabe
Case #: 2:25-cv-14026
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Case in other court:Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, 24-01178CA
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Century Surety Company
Represented By
Michael Simon
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P.A.
contact info
Jennifer Virginia Ortega
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P..A.
contact info
Mediator
Gerald T. Albrecht
Plaintiff
Dream Maker Group LLC
Represented By
Holli Carrol Wares
Weisser, Elazar And Kantor
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 03/07 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 7/8/2025 at 1:30 p.m.. (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 03/05 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Gerald T. Albrecht as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 7/8/2025 at 1:30 p.m.. (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 02/07 10:20 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two-week trial period beginning October 20, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If any party is not an individual (e.g., a corporation), a representative of that party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. The mediation shall take place in person absent good cause shown by the parties. No party shall be excused from attendance without express authorization from the Court. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/7/2025. (cr00)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/07 10:18 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN FORT PIERCE. This case is now set for trial commencing the two-week trial period of October 20, 2025 at 9 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 101 South U.S. Highway 1, Ft. Pierce, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on October 16, 2025 at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for October 7, 2025, at 11 a.m. The calendar call and the final pretrial conference will take place in Courtroom 13-1 (thirteenth floor), United States District Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Parties are hereby notified that this Court requires strict compliance with Local Rule 56.1 regarding the filing of any motion for summary judgment and corresponding statements of material facts. For evidence not previously filed on the docket, and to the extent practicable, evidentiary support for a Party's statement of material facts shall be filed as separate exhibits within the Court's electronic case filing system; the first citation to any evidence in support of a motion for summary judgment or statement of material facts shall provide the docket entry for that evidence using the form "ECF No." In all circumstances, citations to any composite exhibit shall provide both the page number assigned by the Court's electronic case filing system (i.e., the page number of the PDF) and the page number of the document. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/7/2025. (cr00)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 5:03 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Century Surety Company identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ameritrust Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Miracle Nova II LLC, Corporate Parent Miracle Nova I LLC, Corporate Parent Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Accident Fund Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Emergent Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Star Insurance Company for Century Surety Company (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 02/06 4:54 PM
Defendant's Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Century Surety Company.(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 02/06 11:53 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Century Surety Company(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order Setting Trial and Other Pretrial Deadlines
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 01/31 4:36 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Century Surety Company.(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/30 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holli Carrol Wares on behalf of Dream Maker Group LLC. Attorney Holli Carrol Wares added to party Dream Maker Group LLC(pty:pla). (Wares, Holli)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 01/28 12:04 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 1/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 6:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYON M. MCCABE. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge McCabe's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/27/2025. (cr00)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Pretrial Order Mon 01/27 6:06 PM
PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/27/2025. (cr00)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/24 4:02 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Fri 01/24 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18149014, filed by Century Surety Company.(Ortega, Jennifer) Modified on 1/24/2025 (cds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Composite B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Composite C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Composite E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Composite F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H