Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Referred: Amelia G Helmick
Case #: 4:25-cv-00032
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:24 AM EDT
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Petitioner
OSWALDO RENE VELASQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ
A 220 350 594 STEWART DETENTION CENTER PO BOX 248
LUMPKIN, GA 31815
Respondent
MERRICK GARLAND
Respondent
KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Respondent
RONALD VITIELLO
Respondent
Former Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By
ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Mail Returned-9 Order for Response to Motion, sent to Oswaldo Rene Velasquez Rodriguez (TX address) returned as undeliverable reflecting RTS - ID# and Name Do Not Match. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Response to Motion Wed 04/16 8:58 AM
ORDER for Response to7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondents. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 4-16-25. (jdl) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/16/2025 to correct date on order) (esl). Modified on 4/16/2025 to explain replacement (esl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
8 8 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/12 10:01 AM
Mail Returned-5 Order for Response to Motion sent to OSWALDO RENE VELASQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ returned as undeliverable reflecting RTS - Not at this Facility. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 03/05 3:10 PM
SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RUSSELL WASHBURN filed by ROGER GRANTHAM, JR.. Motion(s) referred to AMELIA G HELMICK.(GRANTHAM, ROGER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Acting Deputy Assistant Director Cammilla Wamsley,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Form I-205, Warrant of Removal/Deportation
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 cmp Supplement to Complaint Mon 02/24 12:38 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against MERRICK GARLAND, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD VITIELLO, RUSSELL WASHBURN by OSWALDO RENE VELASQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Response to Motion Wed 02/19 2:56 PM
ORDER for Response to4 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondents. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 2-19-25. (jdl)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 02/19 2:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by RUSSELL WASHBURN filed by ROGER GRANTHAM, JR.. Motion(s) referred to AMELIA G HELMICK.(GRANTHAM, ROGER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of DO Wesley Hargis,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Bond Order, dated 3 15-2023
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Bond Order, dated 10 2-2024
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Order of Removal, dated 10-15-24,
Att: 7 Declaration of Deputy Assistant Director John A. Schultz, Jr.
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order for Response (Habeas Petition) Wed 01/29 8:34 AM
ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by OSWALDO RENE VELASQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 1-29-25. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/24 12:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Helmick issued at the direction of the Court (tlf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 01/24 12:42 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by OSWALDO RENE VELASQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ. Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 43563 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Immigration Documents,
Att: 2 Envelope