West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Joseph R Goodwin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00047
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
King Buffet Grill Inc
1302 Garfield Avenue
Parkersburg, WV 26101
Defendant
Jin Yun Wang
Defendant
Hua Ying Zhu
1302 Garfield Avenue
Parkersburg, WV 26101
Plaintiff
Guangtie Song
Represented By
Paul L. Frampton, Jr.
Atkinson & Frampton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 order Judge Goodwin's Order and Notice Wed 04/16 4:05 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/28/2025. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 6/4/2025. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 6/18/2025 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 6/23/2025. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 7/2/2025. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/16/2025. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (arb)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer To Complaint Wed 04/16 3:14 PM
ANSWER TO1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by King Buffet Grill Inc, Hua Ying Zhu.(Cosenza, George)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/16 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George J. Cosenza on behalf of King Buffet Grill Inc, Hua Ying Zhu. (Cosenza, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 motion Extend Time To File Answer Mon 04/14 10:30 AM
LETTER-FORM MOTION by King Buffet Grill Inc, Jin Yun Wang, Hua Ying Zhu to Extend Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint. (msa)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
3 3 order Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters Mon 01/27 12:43 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 1, 2024. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 01/24 2:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to King Buffet Grill Inc, Jin Yun Wang, Hua Ying Zhu, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (klc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons issued as to Jin Yun Wang,
Att: 2 Summons issued as to Hua Ying Zhu
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8813099. (klc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Sue,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to King Buffett Grill,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons as to Jin Yun Wang,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons as to Hua Ying Zhu,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned Mon 01/27 12:42 PM
CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
Related: [-]