Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-40450

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary P Gorman
Case #: 4:25-ap-04000
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brandon Zanotti
Represented By
Brandon Zanotti
contact info
Defendant
BJZ Law LLC
Represented By
BJZ Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates
Represented By
Thomas Riske
Carmody Macdonald PC
contact info
Robert E Eggmann
Carmody Macdonald PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 order Minutes of Court Tue 04/22 10:51 AM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. Miscellaneous Deadline to review for status: 5/22/2025. (kw)
Related: [-] 10 Continued Generally Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC,15 Continued Generally Motion To Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 order Minutes of Court Tue 03/25 11:47 AM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. Status Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM. (js)
Related: [-] 10 Continuing Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC,15 Continuing Motion To Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
Sunday, March 16, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/16 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Minutes of Court
Friday, March 14, 2025
18 18 order Minutes of Court Fri 03/14 12:27 PM
Corrected Minutes of Court Related [+]. Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM. (tf)
Related: [-] 10 Continuing Status Hearing Regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC,15 Regarding Motion To Stay filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 order Minutes of Court Thu 03/13 4:41 PM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM. (tf)
Related: [-] 10 Continuing Status Hearing Regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC,15 Regarding Motion To Stay filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
16 16 misc Support Brief Thu 03/13 10:03 AM
Brief /Memorandum in Support Of Motion to Stay Discovery Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti Related [+]. (Litzenburg, Deanna)
Related: [-] 15 Motion To Stay filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
15 15 motion Stay Thu 03/13 10:02 AM
Motion To Stay Discovery Related [+] Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti (Litzenburg, Deanna)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/11 4:14 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates. (Gilkey, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/27 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 court Notice Tue 02/25 11:25 AM
Status Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 3/13/2025 at 03:00 PM via ZOOM. (hm)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 misc Support Brief Mon 02/24 12:16 PM
Brief /Memorandum in Support Of Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti Related [+]. (Litzenburg, Deanna)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Brandon Zanotti, Defendant BJZ Law LLC
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/24 12:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Compel Arbitration Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti (Litzenburg, Deanna)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/24 11:57 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti. (Mathis, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/24 11:54 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants BJZ Law LLC, Brandon Zanotti. (Litzenburg, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 25, 2025
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 01/25 1:38 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates. (Lawhorn, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 misc Exhibit Fri 01/24 3:24 PM
Exhibit C - Stipulation of Facts Filed by Plaintiff LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates Related [+]. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 01/24 2:01 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates. (Riske, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/24 1:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on BJZ Law LLC 1/24/2025; Brandon Zanotti 1/24/2025 .. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-docket of Credit Card Fri 01/24 11:45 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-04000 mpg] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A9092960, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 01/24 11:03 AM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/24 11:03 AM
(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by LPB MHC LLC d/b/a Sam C. Mitchell & Associates against Brandon Zanotti, BJZ Law LLC Fee Amount $350.. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]